Shaw et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Venson M. Shaw and Steven M. Shaw
Defendant: Apple, Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics, Inc. and Sony Mobile Communications
Case Number: 5:2017cv00066
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 46 Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/12/2018. (nvc)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying as moot 41 Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss. Granting Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file their Second Amended Complaint within 5 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/31/2017. (nvc)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Apple's Motion to Join In Part Sony's Motion for Improper Venue (document #28). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/20/2017. (nvc)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Tanya Chaney,Angela Mitchell,David W. Morehan,Palak Shah for Apple, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/12/2017. (nvc)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gregory S. Gewirtz for Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/7/2017. (tmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venson M. Shaw
Represented By: Scott Paul Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M. Shaw
Represented By: Scott Paul Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Mobile Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?