Williams v. White et al
Case Number: 5:2019cv00044
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Jury's Verdict dated 3/15/2023. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (kab)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM. IT IS ORDERED that the Warden of the Pender Correctional Institution have the body of Edward Williams, III, before the undersigned United States District Judge Graham C. Mullen in and f or the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina, at the courtroom in the city of Charlotte, North Carolina, on or before March 13, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., to be present for the trial in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/18/2023. (kab)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER that the trial in this matter is RESET to March 13, 2023 at 10:00 AM in Charlotte ( Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom #8, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/18/2023. (kab)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AMENDED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/11/2022. (ef)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND TESTIFICANDUM directing the Warden at the Pender Correctional Institution to transport Plaintiff, Edward Williams, III, so that he is present for trial to begin on Monday, October 3, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., and then return him to the Pender Correctional Institution at the conclusion of trial. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/20/2022. (kab)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 75 MOTION to Withdraw . ( Telephone Conference set for 5/19/2022 01:00 PM in Chambers before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel for Defendant shall MAKE ALL NECESSARY ARRANGEMENTS for Plaintiff to be present at the telephonic hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/9/2022. (ef)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER that the Warden at the Pender Correctional Institution must transport Plaintiff Edward Williams, III, so that he is present for trial to begin on Tuesday, May 31, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., and then return him to the Pender Correctional Institution at the conclusion of trial. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/5/2022. (ef)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that the parties FILE A JOINT NOTICE with the Court no later than 4/1/2022 advising the Court when the matter may be reset for trial. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/22/2022. (ams)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that the trial in this matter is CONTINUED to a date to be set by separate order. FURTHER ORDERED that the writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum for Mr. Williams (ECF No. 63) is VACATED. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/18/2022. (ef)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that the Warden at the Pender Correctional Institution must transport Plaintiff Edward Williams, III, so that he is present for trial to begin on Tuesday, February 22, 2022 at 10:00 a.m.. The Warden of the Pender Correct ional Institution shall ensure that Mr. Williams is present for each and every day of trial until the trial is completed, and then return him to the Pender Correctional Institution at the conclusion of trial. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/22/21. (clc)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER Regarding Trial. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/21/2021. (tms)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER, ( Jury Trial set for 2/22/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom #8, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/9/2021. (ef)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: A Judicial Settlement Conference is set for 7/15/2021 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. The conference will be conducted by telephone. Call-in information will be provided to the parties by separa te communication. Any request seeking permission to modify the terms of this Order shall be filed no later than 7/06/2021 or be subject to summary denial. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/24/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that the parties shall notify the Court within 14 days of this Order whether they consent to a judicial settlement conference in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/7/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have 14 days from this Order to respond showing good cause why Defendants White, Moore, and John Doe should not be dismissed from this action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/11/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the Clerk of Court will send a copy of this Order and Docket No. 14 to the U.S. Marshals Service. The U.S. Marshal shall use reasonable efforts to locate and obtain service on Defendants White and Moore. The Clerk is also respectfully instructed to update the docket in this matter to reflect Defendant FNU Moore as Defendant Thomas M. Moore. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/3/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiff's 1 Complaint survives initial review under § 1915(e) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915A as all Defendants. The Clerk of Court shall commence the procedure for waiver of service as set forth in Local Rule 4.3 for Defendants Susan White, FNU Siciak, FNU Moore and John Doe. For service on Defendant John Doe, the NCDPS shall make a reasonable attempt to identify the name of this Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/25/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?