Highway Markings, Inc. v. Magnolia Advanced Materials, Inc.

Plaintiff: Highway Markings, Inc.
Defendant: Magnolia Advanced Materials, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00071
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
2 Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 2 days. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Motions due by 3/16/2020. Mediator Designation deadline set for 9/26/2019. Mediation deadline set for 2/20/2020. Jury Trial set for 9/21/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell.Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/26/2019. (nvc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Highway Markings, Inc. (Becker, Brett)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Becker, Brett)
June 25, 2019 Notice to Mason Rollins: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/2/2019. (tmg)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mason C. Rollins for Highway Markings, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/24/2019. (tmg)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gregory Lee Cashion for Highway Markings, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/24/2019. (tmg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mason C. Rollins Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4071962. by Highway Markings, Inc.. (Becker, Brett). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory L. Cashion Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4071952. by Highway Markings, Inc.. (Becker, Brett). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 14, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
June 11, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/2/2019. (tmg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Magnolia Advanced Materials, Inc..(Pocock, Donald)
June 3, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Magnolia Advanced Materials, Inc. (Pocock, Donald)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Catawba County Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 790. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4046519), filed by Magnolia Advanced Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Pocock, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highway Markings, Inc. v. Magnolia Advanced Materials, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highway Markings, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Lee Cashion
Represented By: Robert Harper Heckman
Represented By: Brett M. Becker
Represented By: Mason C. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Advanced Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?