Shipp v. US Bank et al
Plaintiff: Robin T Shipp and Robin T. Shipp
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., US Bank and Kevin Goldade
Case Number: 5:2019cv00085
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation Report due by 10/20/2019. (nvc)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests. A Mediation Report is due by 10/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/19/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by Kevin Goldade, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., US Bank. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Scruggs, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appoint Clark Tew as PSAP Counsel. Mediator Designation deadline set for 8/29/2019. Mediation deadline set for 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/15/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint PSAP Counsel by Robin T. Shipp. (Tew, Clark). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Goldade, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., US Bank re #18 Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan (Scruggs, Mary)
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Opt In of PSAP Program by Robin T. Shipp (tmg)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 3/30/2020. Motions due by 4/30/2020. Mediator Designation deadline set for 9/26/2019. Mediation deadline set for 3/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/26/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc) (Main Document 19 replaced on 8/13/2019) (nvc).
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Scruggs, Mary)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion (Captioned Answer, Objection to Defendant's Request for a FedRCivP 12(b)(6), Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) re #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Robin T. Shipp. (tmg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants by Kevin Goldade, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., US Bank. Replies due by 7/23/2019 (Scruggs, Mary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference by Kevin Goldade, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., US Bank (Scruggs, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Delay in Filing Certificate of Settlement Conference by Kevin Goldade, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., US Bank (Scruggs, Mary)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin Goldade.(Scruggs, Mary)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Pro Se MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by Robin T. Shipp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #3 Copy of State Court Complaint, #4 Copy of Defendants' Answer to Complaint filed in State Court)(nvc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Certificate of Service for MERS Corporate Disclosure (Scruggs, Mary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US Bank Certificate of Service for U.S. Bank Corporate Disclosure (Scruggs, Mary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Goldade Certificate of Service for Goldade's Corporate Disclosure (Scruggs, Mary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Goldade Certificate of Service for Case Assignment Packet and Standing Order (Scruggs, Mary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 PSAP Opt In/Out Form mailed to Pro Se Litigant. PSAP Response due by 7/16/2019 (tmg)
June 28, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
June 28, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #2 Notice of Removal by Defendants (Answer contained in Notice of Removal Doc. No. 2-1) (tmg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Scruggs, Mary)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Bank (Scruggs, Mary)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kevin Goldade (Scruggs, Mary)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4077920), filed by Kevin Goldade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet)(Scruggs, Mary)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Woodell Scruggs on behalf of All Defendants (Scruggs, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipp v. US Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin T Shipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin T. Shipp
Represented By: Clark Daniel Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Woodell Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Represented By: Mary Woodell Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Goldade
Represented By: Mary Woodell Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?