United States of America v. Balvich
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James C. Balvich
Case Number: 5:2019cv00103
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Sasarak on behalf of United States of America in substitution for Kunal J. Choksi (Sasarak, Stephanie) Modified text on 9/23/2019 (nvc).
September 16, 2019 Notice to John Kachmarsky: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/23/2019. (tmg)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added John Kachmarsky for James C. Balvich. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/16/2019. (tmg)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/4/2019. (tmg)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The Defendant's Answer To The Complaint (Document No. 6) is accepted by the Court as timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/13/2019. (tmg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James C. Balvich (Raab, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by James C. Balvich.(Raab, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by James C. Balvich. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Raab, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Kachmarsky Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4177293. by James C. Balvich. (Raab, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. James C. Balvich served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Choksi, Kunal)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to James C. Balvich. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tmg)
August 1, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
August 1, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James C Balvich, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Choksi, Kunal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Balvich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Balvich
Represented By: John Kachmarsky
Represented By: Christopher P. Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kunal J. Choksi
Represented By: Stephanie Sasarak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?