Dockery v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jarret Lee Dockery
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv00008
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 Administrative Record - Social Security Transcript (Attachments: #1 Certified Administrative Transcript)(Vainieri, Christian)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andrew M. Saul.(Vainieri, Christian)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Michael Vainieri on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Vainieri, Christian)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew M. Saul served on 2/5/2020 (mek)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed US Attorney General served on 2/6/2020 (mek)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM. Andrew Saul served on 1/29/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (tmg)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285)(nvc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/29/20. (nvc)
January 28, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarret Lee Dockery. (Bowling, Russell) Modified on 1/28/2020, NEF Regenerated (tmg).
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Jarret Lee Dockery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowling, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dockery v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Christian Michael Vainieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarret Lee Dockery
Represented By: Russell R. Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?