Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. v. Guzman et al
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Defendant: Second Life Equipment, LLC, Michael Guzman and Jessica Guzman
Case Number: 5:2020cv00070
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. Jessica Guzman served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Michael Guzman served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Second Life Equipment, LLC served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service)(Farris, Jami)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Writ (Motion for Order of Attachment and Garnishment) by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Attachment and Garnishment)(Farris, Jami). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Second Life Equipment, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (tmg)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jessica Guzman, Michael Guzman, Second Life Equipment, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tmg)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (Farris, Jami)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint) against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4511735), filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Farris, Jami)
May 29, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
May 29, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. v. Guzman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Altman Frick
Represented By: Jami J. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Life Equipment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?