Sparks v. Iredell-Statesville Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Donald E. Sparks
Defendant: Alvera J. Lesane, Iredell-Statesville Board of Education and Hans D. Lassiter
Case Number: 5:2020cv00092
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Vance Smith on behalf of Iredell-Statesville Board of Education (Smith, Lindsay)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iredell-Statesville Board of Education's answer due 10/19/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/9/2020. (DLG)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Iredell-Statesville Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time) (Shive, Colin). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin A. Shive on behalf of Iredell-Statesville Board of Education (Shive, Colin)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Lesane, #2 Summons - Lassiter)(brl)
July 16, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
July 16, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Iredell-Statesville Board of Education, Alvera J. Lesane, Hans D. Lassiter with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4577324), filed by Donald E Sparks. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Field, J.) Modified text on 7/16/2020 (tmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Iredell-Statesville Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvera J. Lesane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iredell-Statesville Board of Education
Represented By: Lindsay Vance Smith
Represented By: Colin A. Shive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans D. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E. Sparks
Represented By: J. Elliott Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?