Lail-Moore v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Irene Lail and Elizabeth Irene Lail-Moore
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation, Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson, Gynecare and Ethicon, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00144
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 11/24/2020. (nvc)
September 30, 2020 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation (Packer, Leslie)
September 23, 2020 Notice to Dawn S. McCord and Ryan C. Brown: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/30/2020. (nvc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Dawn McCord,Ryan C. Brown for Boston Scientific Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/23/2020. (nvc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan C. Brown Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4681102. by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Packer, Leslie). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 22, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dawn S. McCord Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4681085. by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Packer, Leslie). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 and #41 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jon C. Conlin and Stephen Hunt, Jr for Elizabeth Irene Lail-Moore. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/17/2020. (tmg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ward Jackson on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Jackson, Christopher)
September 16, 2020 Filing 42 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation, Attorney Michael Bonasso; Matthew David Keenan; Bryan Pratt; Jon Andrew Strongman; Robert Thomas Adams and Eric Michael Anielak terminated. (Packer, Leslie)
September 16, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven Hunt Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4671480. by Elizabeth Irene Lail, Elizabeth Irene Lail-Moore. (Blocker, Adrienne). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 16, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jon Conlin Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4671403. by Elizabeth Irene Lail, Elizabeth Irene Lail-Moore. (Blocker, Adrienne). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 10, 2020 Notice to Bryan Pratt, Jon C. Conlin, Stephen R. Hunt, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 9/17/2020. (rth)
September 10, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
September 10, 2020 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:12-cv-02466. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
August 26, 2020 Filing 38 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 4955 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 4987 - (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4), #8 Exhibit ECF 6100 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4, #9 Exhibit ECF 7003 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo Anger, #10 Exhibit ECF 7069 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Anger, #11 Exhibit ECF 7173 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Anger, #12 Exhibit ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 7067 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #16 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #17 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #18 Exhibit ECF 7000 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #19 Exhibit ECF 4831 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE re Caraballo, #20 Exhibit ECF 7001 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #21 Exhibit ECF 4832 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE Carabello, #22 Exhibit ECF 7063 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo, #23 Exhibit ECF 4973 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #24 Exhibit ECF 7062 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo, #25 Exhibit ECF 4974 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #26 Exhibit ECF 5029 - Pltf_s Reply to BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #27 Exhibit ECF 5030 - Pltf_s Reply in BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #28 Exhibit ECF 6042 - Memo Opinion and Order re Caraballo, #29 Exhibit ECF 6985 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Culligan, #30 Exhibit ECF 1013 - Exh A, #31 Exhibit ECF 1013 - Exh B, #32 Exhibit ECF 1013 - Exh C, #33 Exhibit ECF 1013 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Culligan, #34 Exhibit ECF 7060 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Culligan, #35 Exhibit ECF 7158 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply Culligan, #36 Exhibit ECF 6987 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Davies, #37 Exhibit ECF 4824 - Pltf_s Combined MTE and Memo re Davies, #38 Exhibit ECF 7052 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Davies, #39 Exhibit ECF 4975 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Davies, #40 Exhibit ECF 5032 - Pltf_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Davies, #41 Exhibit ECF 6030 - Memo Opinion and Order re Davies, #42 Exhibit ECF 6993 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Goldberg, #43 Exhibit ECF 4829 - Pltf_s Combined Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Goldberg, #44 Exhibit ECF 7064 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Goldberg, #45 Exhibit ECF 4980 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Goldberg, #46 Exhibit ECF 5036 - Pltf_s Reply to Dft_s Response to Pltf_s Combined MTE Goldberg, #47 Exhibit ECF 6043 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Goldberg, #48 Exhibit ECF 6994 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Green, #49 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX A, #50 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX B, #51 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX C, #52 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX D, #53 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX E, #54 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX F, #55 Exhibit ECF 1010 - WAVE 1 and 2 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Green, #56 Exhibit ECF 1018 - BSC PTO-119 - Order re Pending Daubert Motions Filed in MDL, #57 Exhibit ECF 7055 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Lonny Green, MD, #58 Exhibit ECF 7159 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply re Green, #59 Exhibit ECF 6999 - Pltf's Motion and Memo to Exclude Guerette, #60 Exhibit ECF 6997 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Guerette, #61 Exhibit ECF 4823 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf's MTE Guerette, #62 Exhibit ECF 7059 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Guerette, #63 Exhibit ECF 4977 - BSC's Memo in Opposition to Pltf's MTE Guerette, #64 Exhibit ECF 4977 - Exh A, #65 Exhibit ECF 4977 - Exh B, #66 Exhibit ECF 4977 - Exh C, #67 Exhibit ECF 4977 - Exh D, #68 Exhibit ECF 4977 - Exh E, #69 Exhibit ECF 5035 - Exh A, #70 Exhibit ECF 5035 - Exh B, #71 Exhibit ECF 5035 - Exh C, #72 Exhibit ECF 5035 - Reply Memo in Support of Pltf's MTE Guerette, #73 Exhibit ECF 6032 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Guerette, #74 Exhibit ECF 6995 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little, #75 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #76 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #77 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #78 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #79 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #80 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #81 Exhibit ECF 7066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Little, #82 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #83 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #84 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #85 Exhibit ECF 7006 - Pltf_s MTE McCrery, #86 Exhibit ECF 7068 - BSC_s Memo in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE McCrery, #87 Exhibit ECF 7170 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE McCrery, #88 Exhibit ECF 6990 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rice, #89 Exhibit ECF 4830 - Pltf_s Combined Motion and MTE Rice, #90 Exhibit ECF 7041 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rice, #91 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Ex A, #92 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Ex B, #93 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Ex C, #94 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Ex D, #95 Exhibit ECF 4971 - Memo in Opp to Pltf_s Combined Motion and MTE Rice, #96 Exhibit ECF 6046 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Rice, #97 Exhibit ECF 6986 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rosenblatt, #98 Exhibit ECF 4833 - Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support, #99 Exhibit ECF 7061 -BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rosenblatt, #100 Exhibit ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, #101 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh A, #102 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh B, #103 Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, #104 Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt, #105 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #106 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #107 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #108 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #109 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #110 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #111 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #112 Exhibit ECF 7002 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Dr. J. Blaivas, #113 Exhibit ECF 4822 - BSC_s Motion and Memo in Support MTE Blaivas, #114 Exhibit ECF 7042 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Blaivas, #115 Exhibit ECF 4962 - Pltf_s Opp to BSC_s MTE Blaivas, #116 Exhibit ECF 6029 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Blaivas, #117 Exhibit ECF 7007 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Dunn, #118 Exhibit ECF 7058 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Dunn, #119 Exhibit ECF 7165 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply re MTE Dunn, #120 Exhibit ECF 7008 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Galloway, #121 Exhibit ECF 4818 - BSC_s MTE Galloway and Memo in Support, #122 Exhibit ECF 7048 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Response re Galloway, #123 Exhibit ECF 4958 - Pltfs_ Opp to BSC_s MTE and Memo in Support of its MTE Galloway, #124 Exhibit ECF 6031 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Galloway, #125 Exhibit ECF 7009 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Guelcher, #126 Exhibit ECF 7057 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Guelcher, #127 Exhibit ECF 7166 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of BSC's Prior Reply MTE Guelcher, #128 Exhibit ECF 7015 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Dr. V. Iakovlev, #129 Exhibit ECF 4819 - BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #130 Exhibit ECF 7050 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Iakovlev, #131 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A1, #132 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A2, #133 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh B, #134 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh D, #135 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh E, #136 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #137 Exhibit ECF 6033 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Iakovlev, #138 Exhibit ECF 7017 - BSCs Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Margolis, #139 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s MTE Margolis and Memo in Support, #140 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh A, #141 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh B, #142 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh C, #143 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh D, #144 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh E, #145 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh F, #146 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh G, #147 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh H, #148 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh I, #149 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh J, #150 Exhibit ECF 7046 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Response re Margolis, #151 Exhibit ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Margolis, #152 Exhibit ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Margolis, #153 Exhibit ECF 7010 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Mays, #154 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo of Law in Support of Testimony of Mays, #155 Exhibit ECF 7065 - Plaintiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re MaysECF 7065 - Plaintiff's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Mays, #156 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 1, #157 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 2, #158 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 3, #159 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 4, #160 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 5, #161 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 6, #162 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 7, #163 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 8, #164 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 9, #165 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 10, #166 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #167 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order Mays, #168 Exh
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 36 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN CERTAIN PARTIES by Boston Scientific Corporation, Elizabeth Irene Lail-Moore (Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 9/5/2018 to add party filer)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PURSUANT TO PTO NO. 293 AS AMENDED BY PTO NO. 298 - NON-REVISION GYNECARE PRODUCTS) The Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to the provisions of the Non-Revision PTOs and, in any case on Exhibit A where the Ethicon defendants are the only remaining defendants, the case is STRICKEN from the active docket; and for any case listed on Exhibit A that resides in the Ethicon MDL and names other MDL defendants other than the Ethicon defendants, plaintiffs shall file a Motion to Transfer MDLs within four (4) weeks of the entry of this Order. This Order is linked to the 6580 Proposed Order to Dismiss filed in MDL 2326. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 34 NON-REVISION ELECTION FORM: Dismissing the presently pending case without prejudice pursuant to the Pretrial Order; filed by Elizabeth Irene Lail, Elizabeth Irene Lail-Moore. (Conlin, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRETRIAL ORDER # 298 FIRST AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES This amended order revises certain future deadlines and addresses filing instructions regarding the Ethicon Election Form; the Order has been amended at paragraphs 2-5, paragraph 8(B)-(H), and Exhibit B; however, the remainder of this Order is substantively identical to PTO No. 293; if a plaintiff has already filed her Ethicon Election Form pursuant to the deadlines imposed by PTO No. 293, she is not required to re-file an Election Form; if an Election Form has not been filed it must be filed in each individual member case no later than 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (btm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES The Motion filed at ECF No. 5313 in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Order Regarding Disposition of Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases is GRANTED; each Non-Revised Plaintiff identified on the Second Amended Exhibit "A", together with any of her derivative plaintiffs with an existing MDL lawsuit, shall file an election form (Exhibit B to this Order) in each individual case no later than 6/10/2018; the deadlines for discovery and trial preparation procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 29 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Elizabeth Irene Lail-Moore. (Conlin, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting MOTION for Change of Attorney Information filed in MDL 2326 requesting that in the main MDL and each individual case in which attorneys John C. Conlin and Stephen Hunt, Jr. appear, the firm information be updated as set forth in the Motion. The Clerk is instructed to update the information, as set forth in the Motion, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2326 with which said attorneys are associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/30/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
October 9, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
October 3, 2012 Filing 25 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Elizabeth Irene Lail-Moore against Boston Scientific Corporation, Johnson & Johnson. (Conlin, Jon) (Modified on 10/4/2012 to correct party filer) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
October 2, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
October 2, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
October 2, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
September 24, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
September 24, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
September 24, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 29, 2012 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 08/21/2012. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 8/14/2012, answer due 10/15/2012. (Conlin, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Ethicon, Inc. re: #1 Complaint. Ethicon, Inc. served on 8/15/2012, answer due 9/5/2012. Summons served on Lisa Fontana/Authorized Agent. (Conlin, Jon) Modified on 12/6/2012 to add text for clarity and to edit date served and answer deadline (arb). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Ethicon Women's Health and Urology re: #1 Complaint. Ethicon Women's Health and Urology served on 8/15/2012, answer due 9/5/2012. Summons served on Lisa Fontana/Authorized Agent. (Conlin, Jon) Modified on 12/6/2012 to add text for clarity and to edit date served and answer deadline (arb). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 20, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 14, 2012 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by Johnson & Johnson. Johnson & Johnson served on 8/9/2012, answer due 8/30/2012. (Conlin, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 13, 2012 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Gynecare, re: #1 Complaint. Return Receipt Card signed by James Janusz. Gynecare served on 8/9/2012, answer due 8/30/2012. (Conlin, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 6, 2012 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Elizabeth Irene Lail for Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc., Gynecare, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies of each mailed to Jon Conlin for service. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
August 3, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Elizabeth Irene Lail for Ethicon Women's Health and Urology, Ethicon, Inc., Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Ethicon, Inc., #2 Summons - Gynecare, #3 Summons - Johnson & Johnson)(Conlin, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Bryan Pratt on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Pratt, Bryan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Matthew D. Keenan on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keenan, Matthew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
July 24, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Robert T. Adams on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
July 2, 2012 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER #10 (Lifting Stay on Discovery) entered on 06/14/2012 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. ERROR: Image is a duplicate of the image attached to entry #2. CORRECTION: Duplicate image removed. (skh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 3 INCORRECT ENTRY; SEE ENTRY #2. (Modified on 7/2/2012 to remove image as a duplicate of the image attached to entry #2) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER #10 (Lifting Stay on Discovery) entered on 06/14/2012 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]
June 29, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-1890960. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lail-Moore v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Matthew David Keenan
Represented By: Robert Thomas Adams
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Eric Michael Anielak
Represented By: Bryan Pratt
Represented By: Jon Andrew Strongman
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Represented By: Dawn McCord
Represented By: Ryan C. Brown
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Women's Health and Urology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gynecare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Irene Lail
Represented By: Jon C. Conlin
Represented By: Stephen R. Hunt, Jr.
Represented By: Adrienne Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Irene Lail-Moore
Represented By: Jon C. Conlin
Represented By: Stephen R. Hunt, Jr.
Represented By: Adrienne Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?