Woldman et al v. First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Plaintiff: Michelle Woldman and David Woldman
Defendant: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00158
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1972
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Ogburn, Thomas)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Certificate Of Settlement Conference by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Responses due by 11/12/2020 (Ogburn, Thomas). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, , COUNTERCLAIM against David Woldman by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Equity Line)(Ogburn, Thomas)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file certificate of settlement conference. Certificate due 11/5/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/29/2020. (DLG)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint) (Ogburn, Thomas). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company's answer due 10/29/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/6/2020. (DLG)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Ogburn, III on behalf of First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (Ogburn, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (Ogburn, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Iredell County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-2082. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4695217), filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings - Iredell Co., #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Defendants' Notice of Removal)(Ogburn, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
October 1, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woldman et al v. First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Woldman
Represented By: James William Surane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Woldman
Represented By: James William Surane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: Thomas L. Ogburn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?