Clarke v. Construction Attachments, Inc
Plaintiff: Cynthia M. Clarke
Defendant: CONSTRUCTION ATTACHMENTS, INC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00186
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cynthia M. Clarke. Construction Attachments, Inc waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Martoccio, Gary)
November 24, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
November 24, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cynthia M. Clarke (Martoccio, Gary)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jonathan Yarbrough on 11/23/2020 by Cynthia M. Clarke. (Martoccio, Gary)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary James Martoccio on behalf of Cynthia M. Clarke (Martoccio, Gary) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/25/2020, NEF Regenerated)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against CONSTRUCTION ATTACHMENTS, INC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4772011), filed by Cynthia M. Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke v. Construction Attachments, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia M. Clarke
Represented By: Gary James Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSTRUCTION ATTACHMENTS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?