Le Maitre v. Chester et al
Plaintiff: Wendell J. Le Maitre
Defendant: FNU Chester, Justin Wineburger, FNU Robertson, FNU Dula, FNU Cox, FNU Lipford and Keith Nadeau
Case Number: 5:2020cv00203
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement; captioned Amended Complaint Adding Document of Grievance Exhaustion by Wendell J. Le Maitre (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope)(nvc)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Wendell J. Le Maitre (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nvc)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Wendell J. Le Maitre. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 01/22/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) as to Wendell J. Le Maitre (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (rhf).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS re #1 Complaint, advising Plaintiff of several essential requirements of proceeding in this Court. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Wendell J. Le Maitre (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nvc)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Wendell J. Le Maitre (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nvc)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Wendell J. Le Maitre. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nvc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le Maitre v. Chester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Wineburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Dula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Lipford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell J. Le Maitre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?