DFA Dairy Brands, LLC v. Primus Builders, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DFA Dairy Brands, LLC
Defendant: Primus Builders, Inc. and P3 Advantage, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00026
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Bergen Barrineau on behalf of All Defendants (Barrineau, Caroline)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Kelly on behalf of P3 Advantage, Inc., Primus Builders, Inc. (Kelly, Christopher)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DFA Dairy Brands, LLC. P3 Advantage, Inc. waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Vogt, Peter)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DFA Dairy Brands, LLC. Primus Builders, Inc. waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Vogt, Peter)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to P3 Advantage, Inc., Primus Builders, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tmg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Hefner on behalf of DFA Dairy Brands, LLC (Hefner, Scott)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DFA Dairy Brands, LLC (Vogt, Peter)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4904623), filed by DFA Dairy Brands, LLC.(Vogt, Peter)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DFA Dairy Brands, LLC v. Primus Builders, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DFA Dairy Brands, LLC
Represented By: Peter William Vogt
Represented By: Scott A. Hefner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primus Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Represented By: Caroline Bergen Barrineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P3 Advantage, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Represented By: Caroline Bergen Barrineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?