Bullock El-Bey v. North Carolina Department of Public Safety et al
Plaintiff: Jamal Bullock El-Bey
Defendant: Russell Chester, Daniel Turner, North Carolina Department of Public Safety/Prisons and NC Department of Public Safety
Case Number: 5:2021cv00084
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Response /Objection to Notice of Removal by Russell Chester, NC Department of Public Safety, Daniel Turner. (McInnes, Alan)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting in part #2 Motion for Extension of Time. If any claim passes initial review, the Defendants shall have 21 days from that review within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/15/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 OBJECTION re #1 Notice of Removal by Jamal Bullock El-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (tmg)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Russell Chester, NC Department of Public Safety, Daniel Turner. (McInnes, Alan)
May 27, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
May 27, 2021 Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 2 (tmg)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alexander County Superior Court, case number 21-cvs-183. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5050632), filed by North Carolina Department of Public Safety/Prisons, Russell Chester, Daniel Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Summonses, #2 Exhibit B--Complaint, #3 Exhibit C--Discovery Requests)(McInnes, Alan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/1/2021) (tmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock El-Bey v. North Carolina Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Chester
Represented By: Alan D. McInnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Turner
Represented By: Alan D. McInnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Public Safety/Prisons
Represented By: Alan D. McInnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Alan D. McInnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Bullock El-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?