McRae v. Niagara Bottling, LLC
Plaintiff: Judameyre McRae
Defendant: Niagara Bottling, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00092
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/15/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted in accordance with this Order.Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 7/15/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc) Modified text on 7/16/2021 (ejb).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #6 Motion for Speedy Trial, as the Speedy Trial Act only applies to criminal cases. Entered by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 7/14/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 Pro Se MOTION for Speedy Trial by Judameyre McRae. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nvc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Additional Claim Response by Judameyre McRae. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nvc)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Additional Claim Response by Judameyre McRae. re: #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Judameyre McRae. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nvc)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $402.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 7/6/2021. (nvc)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Niagara Bottling, LLC with Jury Demand, filed by Judameyre McRae. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(nvc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRae v. Niagara Bottling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Bottling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judameyre McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?