Vitality Anti-Aging Center and Med Spa, PLLC v. Sona Medspa Physicians Group, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Vitality Anti-Aging and Med Spa, PLLC and Vitality Anti-Aging Center and Med Spa, PLLC
Defendant: Sona Medspa Physicians Group, PLLC, Sona MedSpa North Carolina, PLLC, Viva Life, LLC, Sona Medspa International, Inc. and Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00143
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 12/14/2021. (nvc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Tomlinson, Christopher)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sona MedSpa International, Inc. (Tomlinson, Christopher)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc. (Tomlinson, Christopher)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viva Life, LLC (Tomlinson, Christopher)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC (Tomlinson, Christopher)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc., Sona MedSpa International, Inc., Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC, Viva Life, LLC.(Tomlinson, Christopher)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint , #1 Complaint. Defendants shall file an Answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 22, 2021. In the alternative, the parties may file a Notice Of Settlement on or before November 22, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/12/21. (mga)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc., Sona MedSpa International, Inc., Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC, Viva Life, LLC. (Tomlinson, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint , #1 Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including November 15, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/20/21. (mga)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc., Sona MedSpa International, Inc., Sona MedSpa Physicians Group, PLLC, Viva Life, LLC. (Tomlinson, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding trademark numbers contained in complaint. (nvc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5249476), filed by Vitality Anti-Aging and Med Spa, PLLC.(Rogers, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
October 1, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vitality Anti-Aging Center and Med Spa, PLLC v. Sona Medspa Physicians Group, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sona Medspa Physicians Group, PLLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sona MedSpa North Carolina, PLLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viva Life, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sona Medspa International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermatology and MedSpa, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vitality Anti-Aging and Med Spa, PLLC
Represented By: Matthew Kyle Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vitality Anti-Aging Center and Med Spa, PLLC
Represented By: Matthew Kyle Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?