Nicholson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Clifford Thomas Nicholson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv00147
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (kab)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms) (tms)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall issue summons to US Marshal for service. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/13/2021. (tms)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clifford Thomas Nicholson. (Dalton, Aaron)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Clifford Thomas Nicholson.(Dalton, Aaron)
October 6, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Thomas Nicholson
Represented By: Aaron Lee Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?