Heavner v. Burns et al
Plaintiff: Brent Heavner and Brent Shaun Heavner
Defendant: Seth W Burns, Thurman Whisnant, City of Hickory, North Carolina, Hickory Police Department, Seth William Burns and City of Hickory, NC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00159
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: four to five (4-5) days. Discovery due by 9/2/2022. Motions due by 10/20/2022. Mediator Designation deadline set for 2/28/2022. Mediation deadline set for 9/2/2022. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/28/21. (mga)
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Flanagan, Patrick)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/22/21. (mga)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Seth William Burns, City of Hickory, NC, Hickory Police Department, Thurman Whisnant. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Flanagan, Patrick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 10, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/3/2022. (nvc)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Seth William Burns, City of Hickory, NC, Hickory Police Department, Thurman Whisnant.(Flanagan, Patrick)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Flanagan, Patrick)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying as moot #2 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #3 Defendant's Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Answer complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal. All Defendants answers due by 12/9/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/12/21. (mga) Modified text on 11/12/2021 (mga).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, to correct motion title by Seth William Burns, City of Hickory, NC, Hickory Police Department, Thurman Whisnant. (Flanagan, Patrick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Seth William Burns, City of Hickory, NC, Hickory Police Department, Thurman Whisnant. (Flanagan, Patrick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tms)
November 12, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tms)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5312478), filed by City of Hickory, North Carolina, Thurman Whisnant, Seth W Burns, Hickory Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Flanagan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heavner v. Burns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Heavner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Shaun Heavner
Represented By: Jason Edward Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth W Burns
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thurman Whisnant
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hickory, North Carolina
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hickory Police Department
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth William Burns
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hickory, NC
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?