Jones v. Lincoln County, NC et al
Plaintiff: Roger Lee Jones
Defendant: Lincoln County, NC, Bill Beam and David M. Carpenter
Case Number: 5:2021cv00162
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Roger Lee Jones (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Budd, Joseph)
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by Roger Lee Jones (Budd, Joseph)
January 5, 2022 Parties advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court may dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 2/4/2022. (nvc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Bill Beam.(Perrin, Sean)
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. by Bill Beam. (Perrin, Sean) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (nvc).
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Lincoln County, North Carolina and David M. Carpenter by Roger Lee Jones (Budd, Joseph)
December 14, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/4/2022. (nvc)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Roger Lee Jones. Lincoln County, NC served on 11/30/2021, answer due 12/21/2021. (Budd, Joseph)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Roger Lee Jones. Bill Beam served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Budd, Joseph)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bill Beam, David M. Carpenter, Lincoln County, NC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tms)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roger Lee Jones (Budd, Joseph)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Budd on behalf of Roger Lee Jones (Budd, Joseph)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bill Beam, Lincoln County, North Carolina, David M. Carpenter with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5319524), filed by Roger Lee Jones. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - EEOC Charge, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Right to Sue Letter)(Budd, Joseph)
November 16, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tms)
November 16, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Lincoln County, NC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Lee Jones
Represented By: Joseph D. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln County, NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Beam
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?