Craven v. Novelli et al
Plaintiff: Amy Rhinehart Craven
Defendant: Christopher Novelli, Alexander Arndt and Town of Mooresville
Case Number: 5:2021cv00174
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/19/2022. (mek)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Protective Order for Release of SBI File by Alexander Arndt, Christopher Novelli, Town of Mooresville. Responses due by 2/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Flanagan, Patrick). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: four to five days. Discovery due by 9/5/2022. Motions due by 10/4/2022. Mediator Designation deadline set for 3/4/2022. Mediation deadline set for 9/5/2022. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 200 W Broad St, Statesville, NC 28677 before District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/4/2022. (mek)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan . (Houti, Jennifer) Modified text to remove "Consent to MJ text" on 1/4/2022 (nvc).
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Flanagan, Patrick)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Alexander Arndt, Christopher Novelli, Town of Mooresville.(Flanagan, Patrick)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Michelle Houti on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Houti, Jennifer)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Alexander Heroy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Heroy, John)
December 10, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/3/2022. (nvc)
December 6, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
December 6, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Iredell County Superior Court, case number 21CVS2476. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5343857), filed by Town of Mooresville, Alexander Arndt, Christopher Novelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Flanagan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craven v. Novelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Rhinehart Craven
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Houti
Represented By: John Alexander Heroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Novelli
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Arndt
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Mooresville
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?