Rehman v. Nelent, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Rehman
Defendant: Nelnet, Inc, TransUnion, LLC and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00183
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting with modification #12 Defendant Trans Union LLC's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. TransUnion, LLC answer due 3/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/15/22. (mga)
February 15, 2022 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by TransUnion, LLC. (deRosset, Robert). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 15, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC (deRosset, Robert)
February 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christy Cochran Dunn on behalf of TransUnion, LLC (Dunn, Christy)
February 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Cowan deRosset, IV on behalf of TransUnion, LLC (deRosset, Robert)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting with modification #6 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 3/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/10/2022. (kab)
February 10, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC (Goemann, Ethan)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Nelnet's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Nelnet, Inc answer due 3/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/10/22. (mga)
February 9, 2022 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Nelnet, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martineau, Elizabeth). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Martineau on behalf of Nelnet, Inc (Martineau, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Nelnet, Inc, TransUnion, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tms)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, NELNET, Inc, TransUnion, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5368408), filed by Jessica Rehman.(Perry, M.)
December 21, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tms)
December 21, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rehman v. Nelent, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rehman
Represented By: M. Shane Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet, Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Martineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Christy Cochran Dunn
Represented By: Robert Cowan deRosset, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Ethan Coretz Goemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?