Scott v. Above and Beyond Retail Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Scott
Defendant: Above and Beyond Retail Services, Inc. and Robert C. Absher
Case Number: 5:2022cv00019
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint . Above and Beyond Retail Services, Inc. answer due 4/27/2022; Robert C. Absher answer due 4/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/25/2022. (kab)
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Above and Beyond Retail Services, Inc., Robert C. Absher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension to Time for Above and Beyond and Robert Absher to Respond) (Adams, Joshua). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R. Adams on behalf of Above and Beyond Retail Services, Inc., Robert C. Absher (Adams, Joshua)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Join for Daisy A Watson by Kenneth Scott re #1 Complaint (Kinsley, Brian)
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert C. Absher. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Above and Beyond Retail Services, Inc., Robert C. Absher. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tms)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5448947), filed by Kenneth Scott. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Sue)(Kinsley, Brian)
February 22, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tms)
February 22, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Above and Beyond Retail Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Scott
Represented By: Brian Leighton Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Above and Beyond Retail Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Absher
Represented By: Joshua R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?