Paszek-Lowman v. Caldwell County et al
Plaintiff: Administrator Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman and Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman
Defendant: Caldwell County, Sheriff Alan C. Jones, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Vicky Williams, Leon Genwright, Drake Bradley, Bryan Dame, Sandra Laws, Elisha Perry, Brandi Eller, Institutional Medical Services, PLLC, MD John Henry Piland, RN Elizabeth B. Beam, Alan C. Jones, Angela P. Clark, John Henry Piland, III and Elizabeth B. Beam
Case Number: 5:2022cv00046
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #26 Consent Motion to Add Public Administrator of the Estate of Robert H. Parsons as a Defendant. Angela P. Clark as Public Administrator of the Estate of Robert H. Parsons, in his individual capacity, is added as a Defendant in this action and counsel for Plaintiff is directed to submit a Summons to the Clerk for issuance to Ms. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/16/2022. (mek)
June 16, 2022 Filing 26 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Responses due by 6/30/2022 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Ex. 1 Death Certificate, #3 Ex. 2 Order, #4 Ex. 3 Letters of Administration, #5 Ex. 4 Proposed Order) (Mahoney, Carlos). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 13, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Institutional Medical Services, PLLC, John Henry Piland, III.(Fuller, Heather)
June 1, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Call Fuller on behalf of Institutional Medical Services, PLLC, John Henry Piland, III (Fuller, Heather)
May 31, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara R. Lincoln on behalf of Institutional Medical Services, PLLC, John Henry Piland, III (Lincoln, Sara)
May 31, 2022 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Drake Bradley, Bryan Dame, Brandi Eller, Leon Genwright, Sandra Laws, Elisha Perry, Vicky Williams. (Flanagan, Patrick). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 31, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison J. Becker on behalf of Elizabeth B. Beam (Becker, Allison)
May 31, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elizabeth B. Beam (Stark, Kendra)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Drake Bradley answer due 6/17/2022; Bryan Dame answer due 6/17/2022; Brandi Eller answer due 6/17/2022; Leon Genwright answer due 6/17/2022; Sandra Laws answer due 6/17/2022; Elisha Perry answer due 6/17/2022; Vicky Williams answer due 6/17/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/31/2022. (DLG)
May 27, 2022 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Elizabeth B. Beam. (Stark, Kendra). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 27, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra Stark on behalf of Elizabeth B. Beam (Stark, Kendra)
May 27, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Elizabeth B. Beam's answer due 6/30/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/27/2022. (DLG)
May 23, 2022 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Institutional Medical Services, PLLC, John Henry Piland, III. (Lincoln, Sara). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Institutional Medical Services, PLLC answer due 6/13/2022; John Henry Piland, III answer due 6/13/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/23/2022. (DLG)
May 13, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Leon Genwright served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 13, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Elisha Perry served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 13, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Sandra Laws served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 13, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Drake Bradley served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 13, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Elizabeth B. Beam served on 5/9/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 13, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. John Henry Piland, III served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 13, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Institutional Medical Services, PLLC served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Brandi Eller served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Bryan Dame served on 5/3/2022, answer due 5/24/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Vicky Williams served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Alan C. Jones waiver sent on 4/26/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman. Caldwell County waiver sent on 4/26/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Mahoney, Carlos)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman (Mahoney, Carlos)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
April 20, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
April 20, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5534030), filed by Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman.(Mahoney, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paszek-Lowman v. Caldwell County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Administrator Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman
Represented By: Carlos E. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Loraine Paszek-Lowman
Represented By: Carlos E. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldwell County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Alan C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Williams
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Genwright
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Bradley
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Dame
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Laws
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisha Perry
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Eller
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institutional Medical Services, PLLC
Represented By: Heather Call Fuller
Represented By: Sara R. Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD John Henry Piland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Elizabeth B. Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Henry Piland, III
Represented By: Heather Call Fuller
Represented By: Sara R. Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth B. Beam
Represented By: Allison J. Becker
Represented By: Kendra Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?