McClamrock v. Iredell County Jail
Plaintiff: Von Lee McClamrock
Defendant: Iredell County Jail
Case Number: 5:2022cv00083
Filed: June 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:22-cv-00378. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
June 22, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 6/22/2022; that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. (Carter, Alexus) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 6/24/2022.]
June 16, 2022 CASE REFERRED RE: #3 RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE, to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 6/24/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 6/7/2022. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 6/10/2022. (Carter, Alexus) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 6/24/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 5/24/2022; that in forma pauperis status is temporarily granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. (Carter, Alexus) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 6/24/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Motion for Application to Proceed IFP. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 5/24/2022. (Carter, Alexus) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 6/24/2022.]
May 20, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 6/24/2022.]
May 20, 2022 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Carter, Alexus) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 6/24/2022.]
May 18, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against IREDELL COUNTY JAIL, filed by VON LEE MCCLAMROCK. (Attachments: #1 Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter) (Carter, Alexus) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 6/24/2022.]
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by VON LEE MCCLAMROCK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Carter, Alexus) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 6/24/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClamrock v. Iredell County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Von Lee McClamrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iredell County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?