Gannett Peak, LLC
Debtor: Gannett Peak, LLC
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Us Trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Case Number: 3:2023bk30248
Filed: July 29, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Shon Hastings
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Filing 57 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#56 Order to Set Hearing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/14/2023. (Admin.)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Scheduling Order Signed on 9/12/2023. Confirmation Hearing to be held on 12/5/2023 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Deadline to file a plan of reorganization: October 27, 2023. Deadline to submit ballots to accept or reject plan and to file written objections to plan: November 28, 2023. If the Court receives no timely-filed objections (or if all objections are withdrawn), the Court may confirm the plan without a hearing. (sfh, Court)
September 6, 2023 Filing 55 MEMBER CASE - NO FURTHER ENTRIES - SEE LEAD CASE #23-30246. See #45 Order Granting Final Relief on Motion For Joint Administration for details. (mjk, Court)
August 31, 2023 Filing 54 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#53 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/31/2023. (Admin.)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order Granting Motion for Leave To Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #5). Signed on 8/29/2023. (sfh, Court)
August 28, 2023 Filing 52 Final Hearing Held on #5 Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee; Attorney John Krings for Choice Financial; Attorney Elizabeth Lally for Kapitus, LLC; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee. DISPOSITION: Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral is granted. Parties to submit an agreed upon proposed order. TIME OF HEARING: 1:59 to 2:25 p.m. (sfh, Court)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order Approving Application to Employ Maurice B. VerStandig, Esq., and The Dakota Bankruptcy Firm as General Reorganization Counsel for Debtor (Related Doc #16). The application to employ is APPROVED subject to the limitations on compensation provided by 11 U.S.C. 328. This order is not a determination that the services or rates charged are necessary and reasonable. The person or entity employed under this order shall file a fee application in accordance with the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures. See Fed. R. Bank. P. 2016, 2017 and 11 U.S.C. 329, 330. Applicant must also comply with Local Rules. As required by applicable federal rule or statute, the Movant shall serve this docket text only order on all appropriate parties that will not receive notice of electronic filing. By Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 8/28/2023 (mjk, Court)
August 17, 2023 Filing 50 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#47 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/17/2023. (Admin.)
August 17, 2023 Filing 49 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#46 Order on Generic Motion) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/17/2023. (Admin.)
August 17, 2023 Filing 48 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#45 Order on Motion For Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/17/2023. (Admin.)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #5) Signed on 8/15/2023. (sfh, Court)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting Final Relief on Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards (Related Doc #3). Signed on 8/15/2023 (sfh, Court)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Granting Final Relief on Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 3:23-bk-30246 with Member Case 3:23-bk-30248 and Member Case 3:23-bk-30247 (Related Doc #2). Signed on 8/15/2023 (sfh, Court)
August 15, 2023 Filing 44 Second Interim Hearing Held On #5 Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Attorney John Krings for Choice Financial; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee. DISPOSITION: Motion by Debtor for Leave to Use Cash Collateral is GRANTED on an interim basis (from August 16, 2023 to August 28, 2023). Choice Financial is granted until Wednesday, August 23, 2023, to submit any objection to final relief. TIME OF HEARING: 9:57 to 10:18 a.m. (sfh, Court)
August 15, 2023 Filing 43 Final Hearing Held On #3 Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Attorney John Krings for Choice Financial; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee. DISPOSITION: Motion by Debtor for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards is GRANTED. TIME OF HEARING: 9:57 to 10:18 a.m. (sfh, Court)
August 15, 2023 Filing 42 Final Hearing Held On #2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Attorney John Krings for Choice Financial; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee. DISPOSITION: Motion by Debtor for Joint Administration is GRANTED. TIME OF HEARING: 9:57 to 10:18 a.m. (sfh, Court)
August 15, 2023 Hearing Cancelled (Motion is Withdrawn) (Related Doc #7 Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC) (sfh, Court)
August 5, 2023 Filing 41 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#34 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/05/2023. (Admin.)
August 5, 2023 Filing 40 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#33 Order on Generic Motion) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/05/2023. (Admin.)
August 5, 2023 Filing 39 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#32 Order on Generic Motion) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/05/2023. (Admin.)
August 5, 2023 Filing 38 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#31 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/05/2023. (Admin.)
August 5, 2023 Filing 37 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#30 Order on Motion For Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/05/2023. (Admin.)
August 3, 2023 Filing 36 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#19 Meeting of Creditors Chapter) No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 08/03/2023. (Admin.)
August 3, 2023 Filing 35 MEMBER CASE - NO FURTHER ENTRIES - SEE LEAD CASE #23-30246. See #30 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion For Joint Administration for details. (mjk, Court)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #5 Signed on 8/3/2023. (sfh, Court)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Granting Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Claims of Critical Vendors (Related Doc #8). Signed on 8/3/2023. (sfh, Court)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Granting Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages (Related Doc #6). Signed on 8/3/2023. (sfh, Court)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards (Related Doc #3) Signed on 8/3/2023. (sfh, Court)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 23-30246 with Member Case 23-30248 (Related Doc #2). Signed on 8/3/2023. (sfh, Court)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Denying Interim Relief on Debtors Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive (Related Doc #7). For the reasons stated on the record at the August 2, 2023, hearing, Debtors did not meet their burden of showing immediate and irreparable harm or otherwise justify immediate or interim relief. Their request for interim relief is denied. The Court will consider the merits of Debtors motion at the final hearing scheduled for August 15, 2023, at 10:00 a.am CST. Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 8/3/2023. (sfh, Court)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Granting Debtors Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts (Related Doc #4). Debtors alleged cause for granting the relief they seek. The United States Trustee asserted no objection. The motion is granted. Debtors are authorized to retain their existing bank accounts providing they comply with 11 U.S.C. 345. Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 8/3/2023. (sfh, Court)
August 3, 2023 Final Hearing Cancelled On #4 Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #6 Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #8 Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC. (sfh, Court)
August 2, 2023 Filing 27 Hearing Held On #2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #3 Motion to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #4 Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #5 Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #6 Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #7 Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #8 Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Attorney John Schroeder for Alerus Financial; Attorney John Krings for Choice Financial; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee. DISPOSITION: For the reasons stated on the record at the August 2, 2023, hearing, the Debtor's Motion for Joint Administration is GRANTED on an interim basis until final hearing. Debtor's Motion to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards is GRANTED on an interim basis. Debtor's Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts is GRANTED. Debtor's Motion for Use of Cash Collateral is GRANTED on an interim basis. Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages is GRANTED. Debtor's Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive is DENIED interim relief. The Court will consider the merits of Debtor's Motion at the final hearing scheduled for August 15, 2023. Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors is GRANTED. TIME OF HEARING: 2:00 to 4:25 p.m. (sfh, Court)
August 2, 2023 Filing 26 Objection to (related document(s): #2 Motion for Joint Administration with the following case(s): In re Bourbon Street LLC, Case No. 23-30246 (Bankr. D. N.D. 2023); In re Petri Enterprises, LLC, Case No. 23-30247 (Bankr. D. N.D. 2023) and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #3 Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards on an Interim and Final Basis and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #6 Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #7 Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC, #8 Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC) Including Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
August 2, 2023 Filing 25 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC ( related document(s)#3 Generic Motion, #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #6 Generic Motion, #7 Generic Motion). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (VerStandig, Maurice)
August 1, 2023 Filing 24 Witness List , Exhibit List for August 2, 2023 Hearing Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Most Recent Payroll Report for Bourbon Street #2 Exhibit B - Most Recent Payroll Report for Gannett Peak #3 Exhibit C - Most Recent Payroll Report for Petri Enterprises #4 Exhibit D - Budget for Bourbon Street #5 Exhibit E - Budget for Gannett Peak #6 Exhibit F - Budget for Petri Enterprises) (VerStandig, Maurice)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Granting Motion by Alerus Financial, NA for Attorney John Schroeder to Appear By Video Conference at the Expedited Hearings on Doc. 2 - Debtor's Motion for Joint Administration; Doc. 3 - Debtor's Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards; Doc. 4 - Debtor's Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts; Doc. 5 - Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral; Doc. 6 - Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages; Doc. 7 - Debtor's Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive; Doc. 8 - Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors scheduled for Wednesday, August 2, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. (Related Doc #22). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conference. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 8/1/2023. (sfh, Court) Modified on 8/1/2023 (sfh, Court).
August 1, 2023 Filing 22 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Motion for Joint Administration, #3 Generic Motion, #4 Generic Motion, #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #6 Generic Motion, #7 Generic Motion, #8 Generic Motion) Filed by Creditor Alerus Financial, NA (Schroeder, John)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Granting Motion by United States Trustee for Attorney Sarah Wencil to Appear By Video Conference at the Expedited Hearings on Doc. 2 - Debtor's Motion for Joint Administration; Doc. 3 - Debtor's Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards; Doc. 4 - Debtor's Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts; Doc. 5 - Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral; Doc. 6 - Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages; Doc. 7 - Debtor's Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive; Doc. 8 - Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors scheduled for Wednesday, August 2, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. (Related Doc #20). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conference. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 8/1/2023. (sfh, Court) Modified on 8/1/2023 (sfh, Court).
August 1, 2023 Filing 20 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Motion for Joint Administration, #3 Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards on an Interim and Final Basis, #4 Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts, #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #6 Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages, #7 Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive, #8 Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors) Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah). (corrected docket linkage) Modified on 8/1/2023 (mjk, Court).
August 1, 2023 Filing 19 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/6/2023 at 1:30 PM by Telephone conference ONLY. Toll free: 866-821-5980, Participant # 9065076. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/6/2023. Proofs of Claim due by 10/10/2023. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/25/2024. (mjk, Court)
August 1, 2023 Filing 18 Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Thomas Kapusta added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Raschke, Robert)
August 1, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by John D. Schroeder Filed by Creditor Alerus Financial, NA. (Schroeder, John)
July 31, 2023 Filing 16 Application to Employ Maurice VerStandig as General Reorganization Counsel Including: Notice of Motion served on 7/31/2023 and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC Last day to object is 08/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maurice VerStandig #2 Engagement Agreement #3 Notice of Application to Employ) (VerStandig, Maurice)
July 31, 2023 Filing 15 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC ( related document(s)#13 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing, #14 Order to Set Status Conference). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mailing Matrix) (VerStandig, Maurice)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference in a Case Filed Under Subchapter V Signed on 7/31/2023. Telephonic Hearing to be held on 9/12/2023 at 10:00 AM. Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 8/29/2023. Attorney Maurice VerStandig to serve order on interested parties. (sfh, Court)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing Signed on 7/31/2023 (Related Doc #9). Expedited Hearing to be held on 8/2/2023 at 02:00 PM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102 On #2 Debtor's Motion for Joint Administration; #3 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards on an Interim and Final Basis; #4 Debtor's Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts; #5 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral on an Interim and Final Basis; #6 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages; #7 Debtor's Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive; and #8 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors. Written objections shall be filed by noon Wednesday, August 2, 2023. A final hearing on all motions will be held on Tuesday, August 15, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Additional objections to all motions shall be filed by August 14, 2023. Attorney Maurice VerStandig to serve order. (sfh, Court)
July 31, 2023 Filing 12 Copy of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition emailed to Securities and Exchange Commission at denver@sec.gov (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (mjk, Court)
July 31, 2023 Filing 11 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines. SB Statement of Operations Due: 8/7/2023. SB Balance Sheet: 8/7/2023. Tax Return Deadline: 8/7/2023. SB Cash Flow Statement: 8/7/2023. (mjk, Court) (See Lead Case - 23-30246 - Docket Entry #48 for Chapter 11 Small Business documents filed 8/13/2023.) Modified on 8/15/2023 (mjk, Court).
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Sarah J. Wencil Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Wencil, Sarah)
July 31, 2023 Final Hearing Set On #2 Debtor's Motion for Joint Administration, #3 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards on an Interim and Final Basis; #4 Debtor's Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts; #5 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral on an Interim and Final Basis; #6 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages; #7 Debtor's Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive; and #8 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors. Final Hearing to be held on 8/15/2023 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Additional objections to all motions shall be filed by August 14, 2023. (sfh, Court)
July 31, 2023 Judge Shon Hastings added to case. (mjk, Court)
July 30, 2023 Filing 9 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #2 Motion for Joint Administration, #3 Generic Motion, #4 Generic Motion, #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #6 Generic Motion, #7 Generic Motion, #8 Generic Motion) Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mark Petri) (VerStandig, Maurice) (updated for statistical purposes only) Modified on 7/31/2023 (mjk, Court).
July 30, 2023 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC (VerStandig, Maurice) (updated for statistical purposes only) Modified on 7/31/2023 (mjk, Court).
July 30, 2023 Filing 7 (WITHDRAWN at #49 in Lead Case 23-30246) Motion to Alter Payment Structure for Chief Executive and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC (VerStandig, Maurice) (updated for statistical purposes only) Modified on 7/31/2023 (mjk, Court). Modified on 8/15/2023 (mjk, Court).
July 30, 2023 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC (VerStandig, Maurice) (updated for statistical purposes only) Modified on 7/31/2023 (mjk, Court).
July 30, 2023 Filing 5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petri Enterprises, LLC Weekly Budget #2 Exhibit B - Bourbon Street LLC Weekly Budget #3 Exhibit C - Gannett Peak, LLC Weekly Budget) (VerStandig, Maurice)
July 30, 2023 Filing 4 Motion to Retain Existing Bank Accounts and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC (VerStandig, Maurice) (updated for statistical purposes only) Modified on 7/31/2023 (mjk, Court).
July 30, 2023 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Maintain and Administer Gift Cards on an Interim and Final Basis and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC (VerStandig, Maurice) (updated for statistical purposes only) Modified on 7/31/2023 (mjk, Court).
July 29, 2023 Filing 2 Motion for Joint Administration with the following case(s): In re Bourbon Street LLC, Case No. 23-30246 (Bankr. D. N.D. 2023); In re Petri Enterprises, LLC, Case No. 23-30247 (Bankr. D. N.D. 2023) and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Gannett Peak, LLC (VerStandig, Maurice) (updated for statistical purposes only) Modified on 7/31/2023 (mjk, Court).
July 29, 2023 Filing 1 Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Maurice VerStandig on behalf of Gannett Peak, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 10/27/2023. (VerStandig, Maurice)
July 29, 2023 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 23-30248) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1490499. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Gannett Peak, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gannett Peak, LLC
Represented By: Maurice VerStandig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Represented By: Sarah J. Wencil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?