Drain Services Inc.
Debtor: Drain Services Inc.
Us Trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Case Number: 3:2023bk30352
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Shon Hastings
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order Granting Motion to Reduce Time to Answer Discovery (Related Doc #78). The deadline for Debtor to respond to written discovery requests attached to the Motion as Exhibit 1 is December 5, 2023. Signed on 11/27/2023 (sfh, Court)
November 23, 2023 Filing 80 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#77 Order on Generic Motion) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/23/2023. (Admin.)
November 22, 2023 Filing 79 Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2023 Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc.. (VerStandig, Maurice)
November 22, 2023 Filing 78 Motion to Reduce Time to To Answer Discovery.. Filed by Creditor Choice Financial Group (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Reduce Time) (Schroeder, John)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order Granting Motion to Purchase Jetter Model Easy Kleen Groundhog with Accessories (Related Doc #61). Signed on 11/21/2023 (mjk, Court)
November 17, 2023 Filing 76 Interim Application for Compensation for Thomas Kapusta, Trustee Chapter 9/11, Period: 10/4/2023 to 11/17/2023, Fee: $4730, Expenses: $375.58. Including: Notice of Application served on 11/17/2023 and Certificate of Service Filed by Attorney Thomas Kapusta Last day to object is 12/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service) (Kapusta, Thomas)
November 16, 2023 Filing 75 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/16/2023 9:47:49 AM ]. File Size [ 1579 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:17 ]. (admin).
November 16, 2023 Filing 74 Status Conference in Subchapter V Case Held. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee; Attorney Kent Rockstad for USA; Attorney John Schroeder for Choice Financial. TIME OF HEARING: 9:58 to 10:02 a.m. (sfh, Court)
November 12, 2023 Filing 73 Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s) , Amendment Cover Sheet, and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. (Re: #51 Amended Schedules and #21 Meeting of Creditors). (VerStandig, Maurice). (added linkage) Modified on 11/13/2023 (vck, Court).
November 9, 2023 Filing 72 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. ( related document(s)#69 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V, #70 Order to Set Hearing, #71 Exhibit). (VerStandig, Maurice)
November 9, 2023 Filing 71 Exhibit to Plan of Reorganization - Projected Revenues and Expenses Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. ( related document(s)#69 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V). (VerStandig, Maurice)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Scheduling Order Signed on 11/9/2023. Confirmation Hearing On #69 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. to be held on 12/12/2023 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Deadline to submit ballots to accept or reject plan and to file written objections to plan: Thursday, December 7, 2023. Deadline to file or email to the Court all exhibits in support of confirmation or an objection to confirmation: Friday, December 8, 2023. If the Court receives no timely-filed objections (or if all objections are withdrawn), the Court may confirm the plan without a hearing. Attorney Maurice VerStandig to serve scheduling order on all creditors. (sfh, Court)
November 8, 2023 Filing 69 Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Creditors and Classes #2 Exhibit B - Amortization of IRS Secured Claim #3 Exhibit C - Amortization of Choice Financial Group Secured Claim #4 Exhibit D - Amortization of Bank of the West Secured Claim #5 Notice of Plan of Reorganization) (SEE #71 Exhibit - Projected Revenues and Expenses) (VerStandig, Maurice) (added linkage) Modified on 11/9/2023 (vck, Court).
November 6, 2023 Filing 68 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Michael Gust Filed by Creditor Meckler Marketing Consulting, LLC. (Gust, Michael)
November 3, 2023 Trustee's Initial Report & First Meeting Held Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke ( related document(s)#21 Meeting of Creditors Chapter). (Wencil, Sarah)
November 2, 2023 Filing 67 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#64 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/02/2023. (Admin.)
November 2, 2023 Filing 66 Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. ( related document(s)#15 Order to Set Status Conference). (VerStandig, Maurice)
November 1, 2023 Filing 65 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/31/2023 1:18:58 PM ]. File Size [ 15593 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:32:29 ]. (admin).
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Leave To Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #8). Signed on 10/31/2023 (sfh, Court)
October 31, 2023 Filing 63 Hearing Held On #8 Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Kevin Cameron, Debtor; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Attorney Kent Rockstad for USA/SBA/IRS; Attorney Tracy Kennedy and Attorney Ryan Ames for Choice Financial Group. DISPOSITION: For the reasons stated on the record at the October 31, 2023, hearing, Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral is GRANTED, limited to $113,000 from October 17, 2023, thru December 31, 2023. TIME OF HEARING: 1:28 to 2:00 p.m. (sfh, Court)
October 31, 2023 Filing 62 (SEE #65 PDF failed to attach) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/31/2023 1:18:58 PM ]. File Size [ 15593 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:32:29 ]. (admin). Modified on 11/2/2023 (vck, Court).
October 30, 2023 Filing 61 Motion to Purchase Jetter Model Easy Kleen Groundhog with Accessories Including: Notice of Motion served on 10/31/2023 and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. Last day to object is 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brochure #2 Notice #3 Mailing Matrix) (VerStandig, Maurice) (Corrected updated objection period per notice to 11/20/23) Modified on 10/31/2023 (vck, Court).
October 30, 2023 Filing 60 Notice of Change in Hearing from Courtroom to Telephone On #8 Final Hearing on Motion by Debtor for Leave to Use Cash Collateral. Telephonic Hearing to be held on 10/31/2023 at 01:30 PMj. (sfh, Court)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order Granting Motion by United States Trustee for Attorney Sarah Wencil to Appear By Telephone at the Final Hearing on Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral scheduled for Tuesday, October 31, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. (Related Doc #58). Parties appearing by telephone are not permitted to offer evidence or cross examine witnesses at the hearing. Telephone conference instructions: Call 701-297-7116; enter Meeting ID 088076463# and you will be connected to the conference. Please identify yourself after you have joined the conference. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 10/26/2023. (sfh, Court)
October 26, 2023 Filing 58 Motion to Appear By Telephone (related documents #8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
October 25, 2023 Filing 57 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#55 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/25/2023. (Admin.)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order Approving Application to Employ Maurice B. VerStandig, Esq., and The Dakota Bankruptcy Firm as General Reorganization Counsel for Debtor (Related Doc. #5). The application to employ is APPROVED subject to the limitations on compensation provided by 11 U.S.C. 328. This order is not a determination that the services or rates charged are necessary and reasonable. The person or entity employed under this order shall file a fee application in accordance with the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures. See Fed. R. Bank. P. 2016, 2017 and 11 U.S.C. 329, 330. Applicant must also comply with Local Rules. As required by applicable federal rule or statute, the Movant shall serve this docket text only order on all appropriate parties that will not receive notice of electronic filing. By Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 10/24/2023 (vck, Court)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral on an Interim Basis Signed on 10/23/2023 (Related Doc #8 Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc.). Final Hearing on Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral will be held on Tuesday, October 31, 2023, at 1:00 p.m.. The deadline to object to final relief is October 27, 2023. (sfh, Court) Modified on 10/23/2023 (sfh, Court).
October 18, 2023 Filing 54 Notice of Hearing On #8 Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. Final Hearing to be held on 10/31/2023 at 01:00 PM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. (sfh, Court)
October 17, 2023 Filing 53 Hearing Held On #8 Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Attorney Tracy Kennedy and Ryan Ames for Choice Financial Group; Attorney Kent Rockstad for USA/SBA/IRS. DISPOSITION: For the reasons stated on the record at the October 17, 2023, hearing, Debtors Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral is GRANTED on an interim basis. The final hearing on Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral will be scheduled for Tuesday, October 31, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. Counsel for Debtor to provide a proposed order with the terms outlined at the hearing. TIME OF HEARING: 2:27 to 3:40 p.m. (sfh, Court)
October 17, 2023 Filing 52 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/17/2023 2:27:35 PM ]. File Size [ 35040 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:13:00 ]. (admin).
October 17, 2023 Filing 51 Amended Schedules/Statements filed: Schedule AB, Schedule EF, Statement of Financial Affairs, Chapter 11 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Fee Amount $32,, Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc.. (VerStandig, Maurice) (Per LR 1009-1, requested Amendment Cover Sheet, Notice to Creditors of Amended Schedules, and service on two added creditors) Modified on 10/17/2023 (vck, Court).
October 17, 2023 Filing 50 Exhibit List , Witness List Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Budget) (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 17, 2023 Receipt of Amended Schedules(# 23-30352) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1505720. Fee amount 32.00. (U.S. Treasury)
October 16, 2023 Filing 49 Amended Witness List with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor USA/SBA/IRS. (Rockstad, Kent)
October 16, 2023 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Caren W. Stanley Filed by Creditor Tony Hamilton. (Stanley, Caren)
October 13, 2023 Filing 47 Witness List with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor USA/SBA/IRS. (Rockstad, Kent)
October 13, 2023 Filing 46 Exhibit List Filed by Creditor USA/SBA/IRS. (Rockstad, Kent)
October 13, 2023 Filing 45 Conditional Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc.) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor USA/IRS (Rockstad, Kent)
October 13, 2023 Filing 44 Conditional Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc.) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor USA/SBA (Rockstad, Kent)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Granting Motion by Subchapter V Trustee for Thomas Kapusta to Appear By Telephone at the Final Hearing on Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral scheduled for Tuesday, October 17, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. (Related Doc #42). Parties appearing by telephone are not permitted to offer evidence or cross examine witnesses at the hearing. Telephone conference instructions: Call 701-297-7116; enter Meeting ID 088076463# and you will be connected to the conference. Please identify yourself after you have joined the conference. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 10/12/2023. (sfh, Court)
October 12, 2023 Filing 42 Motion to Appear By Telephone (related documents #8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order Granting Motion by United States Trustee for Attorney Sarah Wencil to Appear By Telephone at the Final Hearing on Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral scheduled for Tuesday, October 17, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. (Related Doc #39). Parties appearing by telephone are not permitted to offer evidence or cross examine witnesses at the hearing. Telephone conference instructions: Call 701-297-7116; enter Meeting ID 088076463# and you will be connected to the conference. Please identify yourself after you have joined the conference. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 10/12/2023. (sfh, Court)
October 12, 2023 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Tracy A. Kennedy Filed by Creditor Choice Financial Group. (Kennedy, Tracy)
October 12, 2023 Filing 39 Motion to Appear By Telephone (related documents #8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
October 8, 2023 Filing 38 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#33 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/08/2023. (Admin.)
October 8, 2023 Filing 37 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#32 Order on Generic Motion) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/08/2023. (Admin.)
October 8, 2023 Filing 36 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#31 Order on Generic Motion) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/08/2023. (Admin.)
October 6, 2023 Filing 35 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#21 Meeting of Creditors Chapter) No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 10/06/2023. (Admin.)
October 6, 2023 Filing 34 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/6/2023 9:40:14 AM ]. File Size [ 37016 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:17:07 ]. (admin).
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Granting Interim Relief on Debtor's Motion for Leave To Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #8). Signed on 10/6/2023. (sfh, Court)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages to One Person (Related Doc #9). Signed on 10/6/2023. (sfh, Court)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Retain Existing Bank Account (Related Doc #10). Signed on 10/6/2023. (sfh, Court)
October 6, 2023 Filing 30 Expedited Preliminary Hearing Held On #8 Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Attorney John Schroeder for Choice Financial Group. DISPOSITION: For the reasons stated on the record at the October 6, 2023, hearing, the Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral is GRANTED on an interim basis. TIME OF HEARING: 10:00 to 11:20 a.m. (sfh, Court)
October 6, 2023 Filing 29 Expedited Hearing Held On #9 Motion for Leave to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages for One Person filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Attorney John Schroeder for Choice Financial Group. DISPOSITION: For the reasons stated on the record at the October 6, 2023, hearing, the Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages to One Person is GRANTED. TIME OF HEARING: 10:00 to 11:20 a.m. (sfh, Court)
October 6, 2023 Filing 28 Expedited Hearing Held On #10 Motion to Retain Existing Bank Account filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Attorney John Schroeder for Choice Financial Group. DISPOSITION: For the reasons stated on the record at the October 6, 2023, hearing, the Debtor's Motion to Retain Existing Bank Account is GRANTED. TIME OF HEARING: 10:00 to 11:20 a.m. (sfh, Court)
October 5, 2023 Filing 27 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#15 Order to Set Status Conference) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/05/2023. (Admin.)
October 5, 2023 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#14 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/05/2023. (Admin.)
October 5, 2023 Filing 25 Witness List , Exhibit List Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Budget) (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 5, 2023 Filing 24 Exhibit List Filed by Creditor Choice Financial Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CB-1 #2 Exhibit CB-2 #3 Exhibit CB-3 #4 Exhibit CB-4 #5 Exhibit CB-5 #6 Exhibit CB-6 #7 Exhibit CB-7 #8 Exhibit CB-8 #9 Exhibit CB-9 #10 Exhibit CB-10 one of two #11 Exhibit CB-10 two of two #12 Exhibit CB-11 #13 Exhibit CB-12) (Schroeder, John) (removed capitalization) Modified on 10/5/2023 (vck, Court).
October 5, 2023 Filing 23 Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc., #9 Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages to One Person and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc.) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Choice Financial Group (Schroeder, John)
October 4, 2023 Filing 22 Correspondence Filed by Creditor John W. Baker, Atty U.S. Small Business Administration. (Baker, John)
October 4, 2023 Filing 21 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/2/2023 at 1:30 PM by Telephone conference ONLY. Toll free: 866-821-5980, Participant # 9065076. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 1/2/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 12/11/2023. Government Proof of Claim due by 4/1/2024. (mjk, Court)
October 4, 2023 Filing 20 Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Thomas Kapusta added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Raschke, Robert)
October 4, 2023 Filing 19 Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. ( related document(s) 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 4, 2023 Filing 18 Small Business Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. ( related document(s) 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 3, 2023 Filing 17 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. ( related document(s)#15 Order to Set Status Conference). (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 3, 2023 Filing 16 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. ( related document(s)#8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #14 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference in a Case Filed Under Subchapter V Signed on 10/3/2023. Telephonic Hearing to be held on 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM. Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 11/2/2023. Attorney Maurice VerStandig to serve order on interested parties. (sfh, Court) Modified on 10/3/2023 (sfh, Court).
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing Signed on 10/3/2023 (Related Doc #11). Expedited Hearing On #8 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral on an Interim and Final Basis; #9 Debtor's Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages to One Person; #10 Debtor's Motion to Retain Existing Bank Account to be held by video conference on 10/6/2023 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Written objections to interim relief shall be filed by Friday, October 6, 2023, at 10:00 a.m.. A final hearing on Debtor's Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral will be held on Tuesday, October 17, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. Additional objections to the motion, if any, must be filed not later than Noon on Tuesday, October 17, 2023. Attorney Maurice VerStandig to serve order. (sfh, Court)
October 3, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by John D. Schroeder Filed by Creditor Choice Financial Group. (Schroeder, John)
October 3, 2023 Filing 12 Copy of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition emailed to Securities and Exchange Commission at denver@sec.gov (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (mjk, Court)
October 3, 2023 Final Hearing Set On #8 Motion for Leave to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. Final Hearing to be held on 10/17/2023 at 02:00 PM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Additional objections to the motion, if any, shall be filed not later than Noon on Tuesday, October 17, 2023. (sfh, Court)
October 2, 2023 Filing 11 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, #9 Generic Motion, #10 Generic Motion) Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 2, 2023 Filing 10 Motion to Retain Existing Bank Account and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. (VerStandig, Maurice) (updated for statistical purposes only) Modified on 10/3/2023 (mjk, Court).
October 2, 2023 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages to One Person and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. (VerStandig, Maurice) (updated for statistical purposes only) Modified on 10/3/2023 (mjk, Court).
October 2, 2023 Filing 8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 2, 2023 Filing 7 Small Business Balance Sheet, Small Business Federal Income Tax Documents for the Year for 2022 , Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc.. (VerStandig, Maurice) (requested that filer refile SB Balance Sheet and SB Statement of Operations separately) Modified on 10/3/2023 (mjk, Court).
October 2, 2023 Filing 6 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules , Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H , Statement of Financial Affairs, Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. ( related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 Application to Employ Maurice VerStandig as General Reorganization Counsel Including: Notice of Motion served on 10/2/2023 and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. Last day to object is 10/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. VerStandig #2 Engagement Agreement #3 Notice of Opportunity to Object) (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Drain Services Inc. ( related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (VerStandig, Maurice)
October 2, 2023 Filing 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines. SB Statement of Operations Due: 10/10/2023. SB Balance Sheet: 10/10/2023. Tax Return Deadline: 10/10/2023. SB Cash Flow Statement: 10/10/2023. (mjk, Court)
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Sarah J. Wencil Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Wencil, Sarah)
October 2, 2023 Filing 1 Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Maurice VerStandig on behalf of Drain Services Inc. Sect 521 Incomp Filings Due: 11/16/2023. Atty Disclosure Statement due 10/16/2023. Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules due 10/16/2023. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/16/2023. Schedule A/B due 10/16/2023. Schedule D due 10/16/2023. Schedule E/F due 10/16/2023. Schedule G due 10/16/2023. Schedule H due 10/16/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/16/2023. Summary of assets and liabilities due 10/16/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 10/16/2023. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 01/2/2024. (VerStandig, Maurice) (added Sect 521 deficiency deadline; removed inapplicable deadlines) Modified on 10/2/2023 (mjk, Court).
October 2, 2023 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 23-30352) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1502744. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
October 2, 2023 Judge Shon Hastings added to case. (mjk, Court)

Search for this case: Drain Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Drain Services Inc.
Represented By: Maurice VerStandig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Represented By: Sarah J. Wencil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?