Precisionomics, LLC
Debtor: Precisionomics, LLC
U.S. Trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Case Number: 3:2024bk30203
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Shon Hastings
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Trustee's Initial Report & First Meeting Held Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke ( related document(s)#14 Meeting of Creditors Chapter). (Wencil, Sarah)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order Approving Application to Employ Sara E. Diaz and Bulie Diaz Law Office as attorneys for Debtor (Related Doc #4). The application to employ is APPROVED effective May 17, 2024, subject to the limitations on compensation provided by 11 U.S.C. 328. This order is not a determination that the services or rates charged are necessary and reasonable. The person or entity employed under this order shall file a fee application in accordance with the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures. See Fed. R. Bank. P. 2016, 2017 and 11 U.S.C. 329, 330. Applicant must also comply with Local Rules. As required by applicable federal rule or statute, the Movant shall serve this docket text only order on all appropriate parties that will not receive notice of electronic filing. By Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 6/11/2024 (mjk, Court)
June 6, 2024 Filing 41 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#39 Order on Motion For Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/06/2024. (Admin.)
June 4, 2024 Filing 40 MEMBER CASE - NO FURTHER ENTRIES - SEE LEAD CASE #24-30202 (RE: #39 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration). (mjk, Court)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration on Member Case 24-30203 with Lead Case 24-30202 (Related Doc #2). Signed on 6/4/2024 (mjk, Court)
June 4, 2024 Hearing Cancelled (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC) (sfh, Court)
June 3, 2024 Filing 38 Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs, EUOST Statistical information updated. Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Diaz, Sara) (removed Schedule C from list) Modified on 6/3/2024 (mjk, Court).
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Granting Motion by United States Trustee for Attorney Robert Raschke to Appear By Telephone at the hearing on Debtor's Motion for an Order Granting Joint Administration and Debtor's Motion to Obtain Secured Credit Scheduled for Tuesday, June 4, 2024, at Noon. (Related Doc #36). Parties appearing by telephone are not permitted to offer evidence or cross examine witnesses at the hearing. Telephone conference instructions: Call 701-297-7116; enter Meeting ID 088076463# and you will be connected to the conference. Please identify yourself after you have joined the conference. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/31/2024 (sfh, Court) Modified on 5/31/2024 (sfh, Court).
May 30, 2024 Filing 36 Motion to Appear By Telephone (related documents #2 Motion for Joint Administration) Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
May 30, 2024 Filing 35 Amended Response to (related document(s): #2 Expedited Motion for Joint Administration with the following case(s): 24-30202 filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC, #21 Response filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke) Including Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
May 29, 2024 Filing 34 Small Business Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC ( related document(s) 8 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (Diaz, Sara)
May 28, 2024 Filing 33 Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC ( related document(s) 8 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (Diaz, Sara)
May 28, 2024 Filing 32 Small Business Federal Income Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC ( related document(s) 8 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (Diaz, Sara)
May 25, 2024 Filing 31 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#27 Order to Set Status Conference) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/25/2024. (Admin.)
May 24, 2024 Filing 30 Certificate of Service Filed by Attorney Sara Diaz (RE: related document(s)#27 Order to Set Status Conference). (Diaz, Sara)
May 23, 2024 Filing 29 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#14 Meeting of Creditors Chapter) No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/23/2024. (Admin.)
May 23, 2024 Filing 28 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/22/2024 1:41:07 PM ]. File Size [ 10782 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:22:28 ]. (admin).
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference in a Case Filed Under Subchapter V Signed on 5/23/2024. Telephonic Hearing to be held on 6/27/2024 at 01:30 PM. Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 6/13/2024. Attorney Sara Diaz to serve order on interested parties. (sfh, Court)
May 22, 2024 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Caren W. Stanley Filed by Interested Party CHS Inc. (Stanley, Caren)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Denying Motion for Interim Relief on Motion for Joint Administration (Related Doc #2). Debtor Precisionomics, LLC's request for interim relief on its motion is denied. The Court will consider the motion after the notice period. Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/22/2024. . (sfh, Court)
May 22, 2024 Filing 24 Hearing Held On #2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Sara Diaz for Debtor Precisionomics, LLC; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Attorney John Schroeder for Unison Bank; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee for Precisionomics, LLC. DISPOSITION: Debtor's Request for Interim Relief on Joint Administration is DENIED. TIME OF HEARING: 1:57 to 2:19 p.m. (sfh, Court)
May 21, 2024 Filing 23 Witness List , Exhibit List Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC ( related document(s)#2 Motion for Joint Administration). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101: Loan to Value Calulation #2 Exhibit 102: ARM 2024 Production Revenue & Expense Calculation #3 Exhibit Exhibit 103: 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors - Hove #4 Exhibit ) Exhibit 104: 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors - LLC) (Diaz, Sara)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Granting Motion by Unison Bank for Attorney John Schroeder and Rory Timm, representative of Unison Bank to Appear By Video Conference at the Expedited Hearing on Debtor's Motion for an Order Granting Joint Administration scheduled for Wednesday, May 22, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. (Related Doc #20). The Court finds compelling circumstances justify allowing Rory Timm to appear and testify by video conference. Prior to the hearing, Counsel must instruct Rory Timm on proper video conference protocol and procedures, and Rory Timm must agree to comply with these procedures and local rules. With these safeguards in place, the Court finds cause for granting the motion. The motion is granted. Rory Timm is permitted to appear and testify in open court by video conference. The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/21/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 21, 2024 Filing 21 Response to (related document(s): #2 Expedited Motion for Joint Administration with the following case(s): 24-30202 filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC) Including Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
May 21, 2024 Filing 20 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Motion for Joint Administration) Filed by Creditor Unison Bank, Inc. (Schroeder, John)
May 21, 2024 Filing 19 Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)- The electronic filer will be responsible for informing all interested parties that are nonelectronic filers notice of this withdrawal and a certificate of service will be filed. Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC ( related document(s)#15 Motion to Appear by Telephone or Video Conference). (Diaz, Sara)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Granting Motion by Subchapter V Trustee for Thomas Kapusta to Appear By Video Conference at the Expedited Hearing on Debtor's Motion for an Order Granting Joint Administration scheduled for Wednesday, May 22, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. and at the Final Hearing on Debtor's Motion for an Order Granting Joint Administration scheduled for Tuesday, June 4, 2024, at 12:00 noon. (Related Doc #16). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/21/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Granting Motion by United States Trustee for Attorney Sarah Wencil to Appear By Video Conference at the Expedited Hearing on Debtor's Motion for an Order Granting Joint Administration scheduled for Wednesday, May 22, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. (Related Doc #13). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/21/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 21, 2024 Filing 16 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Expedited Motion for Joint Administration) Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas). (corrected docket linkage) Modified on 5/21/2024 (mjk, Court).
May 21, 2024 Filing 15 (WITHDRAWN at #19) Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Expedited Motion for Joint Administration) Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC (Diaz, Sara). (corrected docket linkage) Modified on 5/21/2024 (mjk, Court). Modified on 5/21/2024 (mjk, Court).
May 21, 2024 Filing 14 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/20/2024 at 1:30 PM by Telephone conference ONLY. Toll free: 866-821-5980, Participant # 9065076. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 8/19/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 7/26/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/13/2024. (mjk, Court)
May 21, 2024 Filing 13 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Motion for Joint Administration) Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
May 21, 2024 Filing 12 Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Thomas Kapusta added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Raschke, Robert)
May 20, 2024 Filing 11 Certificate of Service Filed by Attorney Sara Diaz (RE: related document(s)#2 Expedited Motion for Joint Administration with the following case(s): 24-30202 , #5 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Diaz, Sara)
May 20, 2024 Filing 10 Certificate of Service Filed by Attorney Sara Diaz (RE: related document(s)#2 Expedited Motion for Joint Administration with the following case(s): 24-30202 , #5 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Diaz, Sara)
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 Copy of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition emailed to Securities and Exchange Commission at denver@sec.gov (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (mjk, Court)
May 20, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by John D. Schroeder Filed by Creditor Unison Bank, Inc.. (Schroeder, John)
May 19, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Sarah J. Wencil Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Wencil, Sarah)
May 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing Signed on 5/19/2024 (Related Doc #3). Expedited Hearing On #2 Motion for an Order Granting Joint Administration filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC to be held on 5/22/2024 at 02:00 PM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Written objections shall be filed up until the time of hearing on Wednesday, May 22, 2024, at 2:00 p.m.. A final hearing will be held on Debtor's Motion for an Order Granting Joint Administration will be held on Tuesday, June 4, 2024, at 12:00 noon. Additional objections to the motion, if any, shall be filed by Monday, June 3, 2024. Attorney Sara Diaz to serve order. (sfh, Court)
May 19, 2024 Final Hearing Set On #2 Motion for an Order Granting Joint Administration filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC). Final Hearing to be held on 6/4/2024 at 12:00 NOON at Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Additional objections to the motion, if any, shall be filed by Monday, June 3, 2024. (sfh, Court)
May 17, 2024 Filing 8 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines. SB Statement of Operations Due: 5/24/2024. SB Balance Sheet: 5/24/2024. Tax Return Deadline: 5/24/2024. SB Cash Flow Statement: 5/24/2024. (mjk, Court)
May 17, 2024 Judge Shon Hastings added to case. (mjk, Court)
May 17, 2024 Filing 4 Application to Employ Sara E. Diaz & Bulie Diaz Law Office as Debtor's Counsel Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/17/2024 and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC Last day to object is 05/31/2024. (Diaz, Sara)
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #2 Motion for Joint Administration) Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC (Diaz, Sara)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 Expedited Motion for Joint Administration with the following case(s): 24-30202 Filed by Debtor Precisionomics, LLC (Diaz, Sara)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Sara Diaz on behalf of Precisionomics, LLC. Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules due 05/31/2024. Schedules A-J due 05/31/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/31/2024. Summary of assets and liabilities due 05/31/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 05/31/2024.Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 08/15/2024. (Diaz, Sara)
May 17, 2024 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-30203) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1545504. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Precisionomics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Precisionomics, LLC
Represented By: Sara Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Represented By: Sarah J. Wencil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?