Bruesch v. Schmalenberger et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Dodge Bruesch
Defendant: Robyn Schmalenberger, Patrick Branson, Tammy Homan and Darlyn Kunz
Case Number: 1:2013cv00077
Filed: July 9, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Pretrial Scheduling/Discovery Plan. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Sample Scheduling/Discovery Plan).(KT) Distributed on 10/29/2013. (rh)
November 5, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. re 26 Motion on Questions to the Court Regarding this Complaint. (KT) Distributed on 11/5/2013 (jt).
February 2, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Daniel L. Hovland. The Court adopts 58 the Report and Recommendation and grants 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court denies 50 Motion for Summary Judgment and denies 31 Motion for Summary Judgment.(MM) Distributed on 2/2/2015. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruesch v. Schmalenberger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dodge Bruesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Schmalenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlyn Kunz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.