Wedmore v. Jorgenson et al
Plaintiff: Travis L. Wedmore
Defendant: Brian Jorgenson, Robyn Schmalenberger, Brian Weigel, Shaun Fode, Paul Belisle, Dennis Budeau, Leann K. Bertsch, Corky Stromme, Tammy Schroeder, Colby Braun, Corey Wald, Pat Schatz, Nicholas Yarbrough, Nathan Erickson, Michael Hundley, Jessica Wilkens and Troy Schulz
Case Number: 1:2014cv00149
Filed: November 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: The final pretrial conference set for 1/31/2017 and trial set for 2/14/2017 are cancelled. Both shall be rescheduled as necessary at a later date and time. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 11/2/2016 (cjs).
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 57 Motion For Extension of Time. Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2016. (BG)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 53 Motion to Compel. (BG) Distributed on 10/26/2016 (rh)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part 46 Motion to Compel and Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting in part 51 Motion to Compel; granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Dispositive motions due by October 31, 2016. (BG) Distributed on 9/19/2016 (jt). (Main Document 52 replaced on 9/19/2016 to correct date - re-distributed to Wedmore). NEF distributed. (js)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 42 Motion to Compel without prejudice. (BG) Distributed on 8/18/2016. (rh)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 36 Motion to Compel without prejudice; denying 38 Motion to Compel without prejudice. (BG) Distributed on 6/8/2016. (rh)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2017 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (AMENDED) RE 1915A Screening. The Clerk's office is directed to serve summons, copy of plaintiff's second amended complaint, and copy of this order on defendants. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG) Distributed to Plaintiff and NDAG on 10/2/2015. (rh)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE 1915A Screening. The Clerk's office is directed to serve summons, copy of plaintiff's second amended complaint, and copy of this order on defendants. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 10/1/2015. (rh)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re §1915A Screening. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (KT) Distributed on 6/30/2015 (jt).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wedmore v. Jorgenson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis L. Wedmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Schmalenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Weigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Fode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Belisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Budeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leann K. Bertsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corky Stromme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hundley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?