Mathers v. Abney
Plaintiff: Sean Mathers
Defendant: Adam Abney
Case Number: 1:2015cv00107
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Defendant's 28 Motion to Dismiss is deemed moot. The court on its own motion dismisses this matter with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 5/31/2017 (cjs).
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The final pretrial conference set for 5/23/2017 and jury trial set for 6/06/2017 are cancelled. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 5/12/2017 (cjs).
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/9/2017 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 4/19/2017. (rh)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Staying Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2017 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathers v. Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Mathers
Represented By: Lindsay Marie Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?