Voigt et al v. Coyote Creek Mining Company, L.L.C., a North Dakota Corporation
Plaintiff: Casey Voigt and Julie Voigt
Defendant: Coyote Creek Mining Company, L.L.C., a North Dakota Corporation
Case Number: 1:2015cv00109
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting defendant's 83 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot plaintiffs' 85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and dismissing plaintiffs' complaint with prejudice. (BG)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 107 Motion to Stay; granting 108 Motion to Continue. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 3/2/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 3/20/2018 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (9 days) (Final pretrial conference previously set for 11/21/2017. Jury trial previously set for 12/04/2017). (BG)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re Briefing and Expert Reports by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE) (Main Document 68 replaced on 6/15/2017) (cjs). Regenerated on 6/15/2017 (cjs).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffery D. Ubersax. (BG) Regenerated to Attorney Jeffery D. Ubersax on 5/30/2017. (rh)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nash E. Long III. (BG)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 52 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alina Fortson. (BG) NEF regenerated to Attorney Fortson on 1/30/2017. (rh)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting 11 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. (BG)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles T. Wehland. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voigt et al v. Coyote Creek Mining Company, L.L.C., a North Dakota Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Voigt
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: JJ William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Voigt
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: JJ William England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coyote Creek Mining Company, L.L.C., a North Dakota Corporation
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Stermitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?