Burruss v. Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Burruss, Eric Burruss, Dustin Rook, Justin Heath and Christopher Zachary
Defendant: Wyoming Casing Service, Inc. and Steve Halvorson
Case Number: 1:2016cv00080
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #166 Motion for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents. Closing documents are to be filed on or before September 12, 2019. (RLB)
August 20, 2019 Filing 166 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Documents by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Sokolowski, Joseph)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 (Text Only) ORDER Re: Settlement by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. The Court has been advised the parties have reached a settlement. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 41.1, closing documents are due within 30 days of the date of this order. (NH)
March 13, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #161 Affidavit, #162 Affidavit, #163 Affidavit, #164 Affidavit. Clerk's office added descriptions to exhibits. (cjs)
March 12, 2019 Filing 164 AFFIDAVIT Fourth Declaration of Joseph M Sokolowski In Support of Defendants Motion to Require Plaintiffs Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email from Dana Hobbs, #2 Exhibit 2-Settlement offer for Dana Hobbs)(Sokolowski, Joseph) Modified on 3/13/2019 to add exhibit descriptions(cjs).
March 12, 2019 Filing 163 AFFIDAVIT Third Declaration of Joseph M Sokolowski In Support of Defendants Motion to Require Plaintiffs Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Settlement offer for Christopher Sprouse, #2 Exhibit 2-Email from Plaintiffs' counsel)(Sokolowski, Joseph) Modified on 3/13/2019 to add exhibit descriptions (cjs).
March 12, 2019 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT Third Declaration of Tim Gross In Support of Defendants Motion to Require Plaintiffs Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email from Lance Wipf, #2 Exhibit 2-Settlement offer for Lance Wipf)(Sokolowski, Joseph) Modified on 3/13/2019 to add exhibit descriptions (cjs).
March 12, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #160 Affidavit. Filed in error. Clerk's office restricted access to document per filer's request. (cjs)
March 12, 2019 Filing 161 AFFIDAVIT Second Declaration of Tim Gross In Support of Defendants Motion to Require Plaintiffs Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email dated March 1, 2019)(Sokolowski, Joseph) Modified on 3/13/2019 to add exhibit description (cjs).
March 12, 2019 Filing 160 *RESTRICTED-FILED IN ERROR* AFFIDAVIT Second Declaration of Joseph M Sokolowski In Support of Defendants' Motion to Require Plaintiffs Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Sokolowski, Joseph) Modified on 3/12/2019 to restrict access per filer's request (cjs).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #157 Motion for Leave to File and granting #158 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants may file supplemental declarations and exhibits to #148 Motion. (RLB)
March 12, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #157 Motion and #158 Motion. Clerk's office corrected motion reliefs from Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Motion for Leave to File per Chamber's request. (rh)
March 6, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #157 Motion and #158 Motion. Clerk's office added descriptions to exhibits. (rh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to File re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers Supplemental Motion to Submit Supplemental Declarations and Exhibits by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Declaration of Tim Gross, #2 Exhibit B - Fourth Declaration of Joseph M. Sokolowski)(Sokolowski, Joseph) Modified on 3/6/2019 to add descriptions to exhibits. (rh) Modified on 3/12/2019 to correct motion relief per Chamber's request. (rh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 157 MOTION for Leave to File re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers Motion to Submit Supplemental Declarations and Exhibits by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Tim Gross, #2 Exhibit B - Third Declaration of Joseph M. Sokolowski)(Sokolowski, Joseph) Modified on 3/6/2019 to add descriptions to exhibits. (rh) Modified on 3/12/2019 to correct motion relief per Chamber's request. (rh)
February 22, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #155 Affidavit. Exhibits should have been filed as separate attachments to main document. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed at #156 with exhibits separated and sufficiently described. (lh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 156 AFFIDAVIT (Second) of Joseph M. Sokolowski re #154 Reply to Response to Motion by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email correspondence between counsel, #2 Exhibit B - email correspondence between counsel, #3 Exhibit C - individual settlement offers)(lh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 155 *RESTRICTED - SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS SEPARATE ATTACHMENTS TO MAIN DOCUMENT* AFFIDAVIT Second Declaration of Joseph M Sokolowski In Support of Defendants' Motion to Require Plaintiffs Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers re #154 Reply to Response to Motion by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thru C to the Second Declaration of Joseph Sokolowski In Support of Defendant's Motion to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers)(Sokolowski, Joseph) Modified on 2/22/2019 to restrict access (lh).
February 21, 2019 Filing 154 REPLY to Response to Motion re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers filed by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Sokolowski, Joseph)
February 14, 2019 Filing 153 RESPONSE to Motion re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers filed by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Braziel Dec.)(Braziel, Jimmy)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case, as referral judge. (kmk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 151 AFFIDAVIT of Tim Gross re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Sokolowski, Joseph)
January 23, 2019 Filing 150 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph M. Sokolowski re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Sokolowski, Joseph)
January 23, 2019 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM in Support re #148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers filed by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Sokolowski, Joseph)
January 23, 2019 Filing 148 MOTION to Require Plaintiffs' Counsel to Communicate Settlement Offers by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Sokolowski, Joseph)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #146 Joint Motion for Continuation of Stay. (BG)
January 7, 2019 Filing 146 MOTION to Stay Joint Motion for Continuation by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Sokolowski, Joseph)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #144 Motion to Stay. The action shall be stayed until 1/7/2019. (GD)
October 16, 2018 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #144 MOTION to Stay. Modified entry to add Steve Halvorson as additional filer. (js)
October 12, 2018 Filing 144 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Joint) by Wyoming Casing Service, Inc., and Steve Halvorson. (Thronson, Ashley) Modified on 10/16/2018 to add second defendant to filing. (js)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #142 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #139 Brief Plaintiff's on Representative Discovery. Responses due by 10/12/2018. (GD)
September 14, 2018 Filing 142 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #139 Brief Plaintiff's on Representative Discovery by Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Thronson, Ashley)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #140 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #139 Brief (unopposed). Responses due by 9/14/2018. (GD)
August 28, 2018 Filing 140 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #139 Brief Unopposed by Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Albrecht, Kristy)
August 14, 2018 Filing 139 BRIEF on Representative Discovery by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook, Christopher Zachary. (Siegel, Jack)
August 8, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis A. Gasper on behalf of Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook, Christopher Zachary (Gasper, Travis)
August 1, 2018 Filing 137 STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING / DISCOVERY PLAN by Eric Burruss. (Braziel, Jimmy)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: The parties shall submit a scheduling plan to the court by 8/1/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG) (Main Document 136 replaced on 7/9/2018 to correct signature date) (cjs). Regenerated on 7/9/2018 (cjs).
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: The parties shall submit a scheduling plan to the court by 4/25/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: The parties shall submit a scheduling plan to the court by 4/16/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER re Scheduling Plan by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
February 27, 2018 Filing 132 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Status Conference held on 2/27/2018. (ZE)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 (Text Only) ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/27/2018 at 11:00 AM CST by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court shall initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 15, 2017 Filing 130 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Status Conference held on 12/15/2017. (BG)
November 8, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook, Christopher Zachary of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nathan L. Shaffer II Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
October 27, 2017 Filing 128 ANSWER to #123 Amended Complaint by Wyoming Casing Service, Inc..(Albrecht, Kristy)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: Case Management Plan due by 12/13/2017. Status Conference set for 12/15/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court shall initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 12, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook, Christopher Zachary of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bret McCoy Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Brandon Williams Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
October 10, 2017 Filing 125 STIPULATION of Service by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook, Christopher Zachary. (Braziel, Jimmy)
September 20, 2017 Filing 124 Summons Issued as to Steve Halvorson. (as)
September 19, 2017 Filing 123 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steve Halvorson, Wyoming Casing Service, Inc. filed by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Christopher Zachary, Dustin Rook.(as)
September 12, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Withdrawal of Consent of Jack Sprat (Braziel, Jimmy)
September 11, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agapito Castellano III Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Mark Wilson Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
August 18, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Larry McCoul Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
August 17, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Daniel Prescott, #2 Exhibit B Dylan Mynard, #3 Exhibit C - Ebenezer Amarh, #4 Exhibit D Gregory Sawyer, #5 Exhibit E Jamey Gallant, #6 Exhibit F Jordan Glick, #7 Exhibit G Josef Higley, #8 Exhibit H Kalani Fox, #9 Exhibit I Wyatt Sharp, #10 Exhibit J Zacharias Rivera, #11 Exhibit K Zachery London )(Siegel, Jack) Modified on 8/22/2017 to remove duplicate "exhibit" text in attachment descriptions (lh).
August 14, 2017 Filing 118 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Christopher Alen Herdt Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
August 7, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Aleksandr Shapovalov Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
August 3, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Michael Devenberg Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
July 31, 2017 Filing 115 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Christian Piaquadio Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
July 26, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - John O. Elmer Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
July 25, 2017 Filing 113 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - James Paul Knowlton Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Traven James Sheffer Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
July 20, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ryan Batten Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Dallas Berthiaume Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Bobby Paul Boyd Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Matt Eugene Dabney Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Ricardo Dimas Hernandez Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Jack Sprat Consent, #7 Exhibit G - William Thatcher Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #107 Motion For Issuance of Notice by Alternative Electronic Means and Request For Expedited Relief. (JM)
July 17, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arturo Delgado Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
July 13, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joshua E. Jones Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
July 7, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Steven Aiuppy Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Randy Barker Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Charlie Bennett Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Arthur Bowolick Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Jeffrey A. Brophy Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Travis N. Browning Consent, #7 Exhibit G - Michael Bryant Consent, #8 Exhibit H - Igor Cherneychuk Consent, #9 Exhibit I - Jason Cruse Consent, #10 Exhibit J - Jonathan Darnell Consent, #11 Exhibit K - Robert Decker Consent, #12 Exhibit L - Kevin Dotson Consent, #13 Exhibit M - Lincoln Eads Consent, #14 Exhibit N - Carlos Fair Consent, #15 Exhibit O - Graydon Feichter Consent, #16 Exhibit P - William D. Forrest Consent, #17 Exhibit Q - Bradley Foss Consent, #18 Exhibit R - Tom Foster Consent, #19 Exhibit S - Kalani Fox Consent, #20 Exhibit T - Jesus J. Franco Consent, #21 Exhibit U - Jonathan Gartland Consent, #22 Exhibit V - Eric Givens, Jr., Consent, #23 Exhibit W - Eric L. Givens, Sr., Consent, #24 Exhibit X - Jordon Gordon Consent, #25 Exhibit Y - Ben Griffith Consent, #26 Exhibit Z - Mark Holsinger Consent, #27 Exhibit AA - Brandon Hopkins Consent, #28 Exhibit BB - Jonathan P. Jankowsky Consent, #29 Exhibit CC - Matthew B. Joss Consent, #30 Exhibit DD - Mark Kelly Consent, #31 Exhibit EE - Kyle L. Klaus Consent, #32 Exhibit FF - Brian Leith Consent, #33 Exhibit GG - Zachary Michael London Consent, #34 Exhibit HH - Trevor William Lyne Consent, #35 Exhibit II - Shawn Marsh Consent, #36 Exhibit JJ - Lloyd Martinez Consent, #37 Exhibit KK - Ryan Maynard Consent, #38 Exhibit LL - Michael McNamara Consent, #39 Exhibit MM - Ryan Colby McNutt Consent, #40 Exhibit NN - Mark Kevin Minson Consent, #41 Exhibit OO - Armando Mondragon Consent, #42 Exhibit PP - Douglas Ogden Morse Consent, #43 Exhibit QQ - Lenard Harold O'dneal Consent, #44 Exhibit RR - Anthony Paski Consent, #45 Exhibit SS - Travis Peterson Consent, #46 Exhibit TT - Brandon Scott Pollock Consent, #47 Exhibit UU - Robert Pond Consent, #48 Exhibit VV - Andrey Ponkratov Consent, #49 Exhibit WW - Prince Richard Consent, #50 Exhibit XX - Alan Riediger Consent, #51 Exhibit YY - Zacharias Rivera Consent, #52 Exhibit ZZ - Devynn Saathoff Consent, #53 Exhibit AAA - Kurt Salmen Consent, #54 Exhibit BBB - Terry Ray Sandau Consent, #55 Exhibit CCC - Brendon Sewell Consent, #56 Exhibit DDD - Samuel Sikora Consent, #57 Exhibit EEE - William Smart Consent, #58 Exhibit FFF - Brian Steele Consent, #59 Exhibit GGG - Alexander Sundita Consent, #60 Exhibit HHH - Bobby Eugene Thomas, Jr., Consent, #61 Exhibit III - Devon Urroz Consent, #62 Exhibit JJJ - Kelsy Urroz Consent, #63 Exhibit KKK - Taylor Van Meer Consent, #64 Exhibit LLL - Stewart Samuel Vaughn Consent, #65 Exhibit MMM - Lance Wipf Consent, #66 Exhibit NNN - Wesley Wittrock Consent, #67 Exhibit OOO - Scott Woodward Consent, #68 Exhibit PPP - Clayton Russ Young Consent, #69 Exhibit QQQ - Christopher Zachary Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
June 28, 2017 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #107 MOTION (Miscellaneous Relief). Clerks office added descriptions to attachments A, B, and C. (js)
June 27, 2017 Filing 107 MOTION For Issuance of Notice by Alternative Electronic Means and Request For Expedited Relief by Eric Burruss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence from Sokolowski to Braziel dated 5/10/2017, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence from Braziel to Sokilowski dated 5/4/2017, #3 Exhibit C - Email Correspondence from Braziel to Sokolowski dated 5/11/2017)(Braziel, Jimmy) Modified on 6/28/2017 to add exhibit descriptions. (js)
June 16, 2017 Filing 106 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Donald Cenkner Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Gregory Sawyer Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Chance T. Wilhelm Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
June 9, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - David Gustanski Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
June 5, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Christopher A. Bennett Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Amber Brown Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 31, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robert C. Duda, Jr. Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Will J. Gachassin Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Jordon Gordon Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Ardie Lee Huffman Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Koang Mot Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Darren R. Wyer Consent, #7 Exhibit G - Curtis Ylitalo Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 26, 2017 Filing 102 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jack Adams Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Donnie Courson Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Gerald Elijah Davis Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Brandon Gibson Consent, #5 Exhibit E - George Heskell, Jr. Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Tyler Hess Consent, #7 Exhibit G - Markus Tolkkinen Consent, #8 Exhibit H - Jazzmon Washington Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 22, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - David Foster Consent, #2 Exhibit B - David Neuenschwander Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Eric Perry Consent, #4 Exhibit D - James Steele Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 19, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nikolay Korchemniy Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 19, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Matthew Carroll Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Daniel Dalton Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Hans David Heyer Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Solomon C. Lees Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Kyle Leljedal Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Timothy Myers Consent, #7 Exhibit G - Reynaldo Perez Consent, #8 Exhibit H - Robert F. Richmond Consent, #9 Exhibit I - Jeremy Rook Consent, #10 Exhibit J - Cody Schoonover Consent, #11 Exhibit K - Richard J. Simmons Consent, #12 Exhibit L - Levi Warwas Consent, #13 Exhibit M - Daniel Wipf, Sr. Consent, #14 Exhibit N - Raymond Wolf Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 15, 2017 Filing 98 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bruno Day Consent, #2 Exhibit B - James Desiato Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Michael Desiato Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Larry W. Drawdy, Jr. Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Jeremy Hearn Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Jerred Koch Consent, #7 Exhibit G - Michael Sanchez Consent, #8 Exhibit H - Vitaliy Shulga Consent, #9 Exhibit I - Taylor Woznicki Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 12, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chris Archer Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Tyler Bailey Consent, #3 Exhibit C - John A. Burr Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Lantz Cameron Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Todd Lee Edwards Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Chris Gore Consent, #7 Exhibit G - Raymond Greene, Sr. Consent, #8 Exhibit H - Mitchell Higley Consent, #9 Exhibit I - Joshua Ingram Consent, #10 Exhibit J - Andrei Juc Consent, #11 Exhibit K - Marty Kilpela Consent, #12 Exhibit L - Simon Ochoa Consent, #13 Exhibit M - Michael Riediger Consent, #14 Exhibit N - Ray Sturdivant Consent, #15 Exhibit O - Mark Tomjack Consent, #16 Exhibit P - Anthony J. Umphlett Consent, #17 Exhibit Q - Gregory Voner Consent, #18 Exhibit R - Penny Woodhead Consent, #19 Exhibit S - Chester Worley Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 8, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Juan Carlos Arambul Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Nicholas Dunker Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Joe Fedor Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Steven Greer Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Bryan Hauger Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Rene Lopez Consent, #7 Exhibit G - Cody Minor Consent, #8 Exhibit H - Loren Patterson Consent, #9 Exhibit I - Kevin Whitney Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 5, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kyle Crowe Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Gonzalo Franco Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Joshua Ingram Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Doug Renteria Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Jerry Schoenfeld Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Cameron Shuff Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
May 2, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Sending Notices (Forester, Jesse (Jay))
April 6, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tyler Luce Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #45 motion for conditional certification (MM)
March 6, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Matt Carroll Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Lauden D. Holmes Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Kyle Leljedal Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
March 1, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Daniel Lee Prescott Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
February 20, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Darnell Owens Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
November 22, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Phillip Johnson Jr. Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
November 17, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trevor Bowlby Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
November 14, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jesse Foote Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
November 9, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jonathon Beagley Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
October 25, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kodie Kenfield Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
October 21, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ruslan Kolosov Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
October 19, 2016 Filing 82 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sean Emerton Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Ebenezer Amarh Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
October 19, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mario Arcadia Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Ryan Decker Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Russell Henry Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
October 15, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Ioan Tomoiaga Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
October 9, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Dylan Maynard Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
October 7, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Josef Higley Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
October 6, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Blake Powell Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
October 3, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nicholas Hodges Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Derek Lindskov Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
September 28, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robert Anderson Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
September 27, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Michael Calhoun Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
September 21, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alfranzo Kurtz Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Roy Johnson Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
September 19, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jeremy Graham Consent)(Braziel, Jimmy)
September 8, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jordan Wilson Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
September 7, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chance Appledoorn Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
August 29, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hercules Cummings Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Ian D. Murphy Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Josh Rosbach Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Markneil Silva Consent)(Forester, Jesse (Jay))
August 24, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robby Dooley Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Ned Silverman Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
August 21, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Travis Rintamaki Consent, #2 Exhibit B - James Bungert Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Drew Niskanen Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Paul Savela Consent)(Siegel, Jack) Modified on 8/29/2016 to remove duplicate Ex. text (lh).
August 15, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jeffrey Flores Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
August 11, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jason Bergum Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Austin Morse Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Michael Harriss Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Chris Hopkins Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
August 8, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Seth Des Champs Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
August 5, 2016 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. NOTICE of Direct Assignment deadlines terminated - case was reassigned to Judge Hovland at doc. #57. (lh)
August 5, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - David Weir Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
August 3, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jose Morales Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Brian Bateman Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Adam Rosenberg Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
August 3, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Withdrawal of Consent (Blake Powell) (Siegel, Jack)
August 2, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anthony Wise Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
July 29, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cecil Tuiel Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Jonathan Battles Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
July 28, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Israel Prado Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson.(SH)
July 26, 2016 Filing 56 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 7/26/2016. Pursuant to the discussion with the parties, the court will not enter a scheduling order at this time. (ST)
July 21, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Christopher Holt Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Matthew Walsh Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
July 19, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Steven Fetrow Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Tyler Hess Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Ethan Moore Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
July 18, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jason Browning Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Marciano Prado Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 7/26/2016 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court will initiate the conference call. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Conference previously set for 7/18/2016) (BG)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling conference set for 7/18/2016 is cancelled. It shall be rescheduled at date and time to be determined. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 14, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dustin Shilling Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
July 13, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Josh Hoppes Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Brad Driscoll Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
July 5, 2016 Filing 48 SUPPLEMENT to document: #46 MEMORANDUM in Support by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LL - Burruss Declaration)(Siegel, Jack) Modified on 7/6/2016 to add exhibit letter. (rh)
July 5, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ray Hughes Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Brandon Smith Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
July 1, 2016 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support re #45 MOTION for Notice & Conditional Certification filed by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Elliot v. Schlumberger Tech Corp., 3:13-cv-79 (Doc. 87), #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit E - Adams Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - Baker Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - Bass Declaration, #8 Exhibit H - Beach Declaration, #9 Exhibit I - Benson Declaration, #10 Exhibit J - Burdette Declaration, #11 Exhibit K - Cora Declaration, #12 Exhibit L - Decker Declaration, #13 Exhibit M - A. Deschamps Declaration, #14 Exhibit N - I. Deschamps Declaration, #15 Exhibit O - Emerton Declaration, #16 Exhibit P - Fairbanks Declaration, #17 Exhibit Q - Gerber Declaration, #18 Exhibit R - Goss Declaration, #19 Exhibit S - Heath Declaration, #20 Exhibit T - Heinze Declaration, #21 Exhibit U - Henry Declaration, #22 Exhibit V - Hobbs Declaration, #23 Exhibit W - Holadnak Declaration, #24 Exhibit X - Kasier Declaration, #25 Exhibit Y - Leljedal Declaration, #26 Exhibit Z - Loussedes Declaration, #27 Exhibit AA - Miller Declaration, #28 Exhibit BB - Mondragon Declaration, #29 Exhibit CC - Mytty Declaration, #30 Exhibit DD - Passalaqua Declaration, #31 Exhibit EE - Rook Declaration, #32 Exhibit FF - B. Snyder Declaration, #33 Exhibit GG - T. Snyder Declaration, #34 Exhibit HH - Sprouse Declaration, #35 Exhibit II - Wolf Declaration, #36 Exhibit JJ - Albury Declaration, #37 Exhibit KK - Anderson Declaration)(Siegel, Jack)
July 1, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION for Notice & Conditional Certification by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook. (Siegel, Jack)
June 30, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Michael Johnson Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 27, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jason Cesaro Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Vladimir Shulga Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Jordan Glick Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 24, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Billy Stanton Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Zachery Watson Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Gregory Smith Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 24, 2016 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wyoming Casing Service, Inc. filed by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Second Amended Complaint)(Siegel, Jack)
June 23, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cody Schoonover Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 22, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Ronald D. McCoy Consent, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Jarrod Schnabel Consent, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Luke Schnabel Consent, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Austin James Miller Consent, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Brian Freund Consent, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Joe Hintz Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
June 20, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robin Dorris Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Joseph Mohn Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 17, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Jack Hill Consent, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Travis James Soltis Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
June 16, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sven Johnson Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Tyler Benson Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Brandon Snyder Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 15, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Austin Miller Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Michael Leddy Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Derek Heinze Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Matthew Wheeler Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Troy Snyder Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Dustin Loussedes Consent, #7 Exhibit G - Blake Powell Consent, #8 Exhibit H - Andy Smith Consent, #9 Exhibit I - Tyler Leljedal Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 15, 2016 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Albrecht, Kristy)
June 15, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Austin Miller Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Michael Leddy Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Derek Heinze Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Matthew Wheeler Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Troy Snyder Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Dustin Loussedes Consent, #7 Exhibit G - Blake Powell Consent, #8 Exhibit H - Andy Smith Consent, #9 Exhibit I - Tyler Leljedal Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2016 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 14, 2016 Filing 31 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, by Wyoming Casing Service, Inc..(Thronson, Ashley)
June 13, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Christian Miller Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Rogelio Rivera, II Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ashley R. Thronson and granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph M. Sokolowski. (ST) Regenerated NEF on 6/10/2016 (jt).
June 10, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph M. Sokolowski (Filing fee $150, receipt number 116001076) by Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (jt)
June 10, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashley R. Thronson (Filing fee $150, receipt number 116001077) by Wyoming Casing Service, Inc. (jt)
June 6, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ryan Gerber Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Scott Kritzmire Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Jerry Marcum Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Mark Yingling Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Timothy Holodnak Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
June 3, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Derek Passalaqua Consent, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Matthew Bass Consent, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Raymond Wolf Consent, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Harold Charles Beach Consent, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Dana Hobbs Consent, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Chris Sprouse Consent, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Jeremy Rook Consent)(Siegel, Jack)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #23 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 6/14/2016 to file an answer or otherwise respond. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 31, 2016 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.. (Albrecht, Kristy)
May 27, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Josh Schmidt Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Seth Albury Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
May 24, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - James McBride Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
May 23, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Craig Kirk Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Dillon Kaiser Consent, #3 Exhibit C - John Herbster Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Justin Mytty Consent, #5 Exhibit E - Samuel Emerton Consent, #6 Exhibit F - Thomas Baker Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
May 19, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - John Adams Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Justin Cora Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
May 13, 2016 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA. Wrong event selected. Counsel should have filed as "SUMMONS Returned Executed" (not as to USA). Clerk's office corrected answer due deadline from 7/8/2016 to 5/30/2016 beacause defendant Wyoming Casing Services, Inc. is not a United States Agency. (as)
May 13, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Wyoming Casing Service, Inc. answer due 5/30/2016. (as)
May 12, 2016 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath and Dustin Rook. Wyoming Casing Service, Inc. served on 5/9/2016, answer due 5/30/2016. (Forester, Jesse) Modified on 5/13/2016 to correct answer due date. (as)
May 12, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mickey Athan Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Tim Burge Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
May 11, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brian Petersen Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
May 10, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bobby Adams Consent, #2 Exhibit B - David Mues Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
May 6, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE by Eric Burruss, Justin Heath, Dustin Rook of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Justin Heath Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Michael Heath Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
May 4, 2016 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 AMENDED COMPLAINT. Complaint adds parties. Counsel should not file a complaint that adds parties and instead should e-mail the complaint to the court. Clerk's office added plaintiffs Dustin Rook and Justin Heath. (as)
May 4, 2016 Filing 13 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Eric Burruss. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/11/2016. (as)
May 4, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Justin Heath. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/18/2016. (as)
May 4, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Dustin Rook. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/18/2016. (as)
May 3, 2016 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eric Burruss.(Siegel, Jack)
May 2, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE by Eric Burruss of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dustin Rook Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Richard Harper Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
April 29, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE by Eric Burruss of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alvie Heath Consent, #2 Exhibit B - John French Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
April 26, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE by Eric Burruss of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joel Mondragon Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Thomas Goss, III Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
April 25, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE by Eric Burruss of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Beau Reimann Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Brandon Dukart Consent, #3 Exhibit C - James Waller Consent)(Forester, Jesse)
April 22, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE by Eric Burruss of Filing Additional Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Aaron Deschamps Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Chance Wilhelm, #3 Exhibit C - David Graybill, #4 Exhibit D - Dustin Fairbanks, #5 Exhibit E - George Anderson, Jr., #6 Exhibit F - Israel Deschamps, #7 Exhibit G - Nicholas Salerno, #8 Exhibit H - Robert Burdette, #9 Exhibit I - Stan Ely)(Forester, Jesse)
April 19, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Eric Burruss. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/3/2016. (rh)
April 19, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wyoming Casing Service, Inc. (rh)
April 19, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Additional Consents by Eric Burruss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent of Andrei Juc, #2 Exhibit B - Consent of Benjamin Mayer, #3 Exhibit C - Consent of Chris Sergeon)(rh)
April 19, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wyoming Casing Service, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 116000866) filed by Eric Burruss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent to be a Party Plaintiff, #2 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burruss v. Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Burruss
Represented By: Jimmy Derek Braziel
Represented By: Jesse (Jay) Forester
Represented By: Jack Siegel
Represented By: Travis A. Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Rook
Represented By: Jimmy Derek Braziel
Represented By: Jesse (Jay) Forester
Represented By: Jack Siegel
Represented By: Travis A. Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Heath
Represented By: Jimmy Derek Braziel
Represented By: Jesse (Jay) Forester
Represented By: Jack Siegel
Represented By: Travis A. Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Zachary
Represented By: Jimmy Derek Braziel
Represented By: Jesse (Jay) Forester
Represented By: Jack Siegel
Represented By: Travis A. Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Casing Service, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Represented By: Ashley R. Thronson
Represented By: Kristy L. Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Halvorson
Represented By: Ashley R. Thronson
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Represented By: Kristy L. Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?