Continental Resources, Inc. v. Rink Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Continental Resources, Inc.
Defendant: Rink Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00091
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER adopting 87 Stipulation to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/14/2020. Discovery Motions due by 9/14/2020. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 12/14/2020. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Rep orts due by 9/14/2020. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/14/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 4/20/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalte r. Jury Trial REset for 5/3/2021 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (2 days). Status Conference REset for 9/14/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Status Conference, FPT, and Jury trial previously set for 6/17/2020, 1/19/2021, and 2/01/2021) (BG)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER (Amended): Status Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (change in time only)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 52 Motion for Hearing; denying 61 Motion to Stay; granting 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (MM)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Defendant shall have until 1/12/2018 to supplement its response to plaintiff's 18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendant shall have until 2/02/2018 to reply to defendant's supplemental response. Final Pretrial Confer ence REset for 10/31/2018 at 2:00 PM in telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 11/14/2018 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (3 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER STAYING CASE by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Case is stayed and all deadlines are suspended pending further order of the court.(ZE)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2017 at 01:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE) (Main Document 16 replaced on 8/2/2016 to correct date in document. Regenerated NEF.) (rh)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2016 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Resources, Inc. v. Rink Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Danielle M. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rink Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Rowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?