Schoeder Family LLLP v. Adams County, North Dakota

Plaintiff: Schoeder Family LLLP
Defendant: Adams County, North Dakota
Case Number: 1:2016cv00258
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER adopting Stipulation to Amend Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 11/1/2017. Discovery Motions due by 2/1/2018. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/1/2017. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/1/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2018. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 12/1/2017. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 10/30/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2018 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (3 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Final Pretrial Conference and Trial previously set for 5/15/2018 and 5/30/2018 respectively)(BG)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2018 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2016 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoeder Family LLLP v. Adams County, North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schoeder Family LLLP
Represented By: Thomas M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County, North Dakota
Represented By: Scott K. Porsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?