Ross v. Heller Casing Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monty Ross
Defendant: Heller Casing Service, Inc. and Casey Heller
Case Number: 1:2016cv00352
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER lifting stay, setting pretrial deadlines, and continuing the final pretrial conference and trial. Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2018. Discovery due by 1/24/2019., Discovery Motions due by 2/7/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures an d Reports due by 11/26/2018. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/10/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 4/24/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 1/24/2019. Threshold Motions due by 9/ 24/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. Jury Trial set for 9/30/2019 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER adopting 43 Stipulation filed by Monty Ross by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Adopting 39 Stipulation filed by Monty Ross by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE) (Main Document 40 replaced on 1/3/2018 to correct date of Order. Regenerated NEF.) (rh)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Adopting 37 Stipulation filed by Monty Ross by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 Stipulation for Stay and Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Report. The above-entitled action shall be stayed until December 1, 2017, or until completion of settlement negotiations, which ever occurs earlier. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Heller Casing Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heller Casing Service, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Heller
Represented By: Kevin Joseph Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Ross
Represented By: Jimmy Derek Braziel
Represented By: Jesse (Jay) Forester
Represented By: Jack Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?