Northern Oil & Gas, Inc. v. EOG Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: Northern Oil & Gas, Inc.
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00388
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re 61 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice. Status report due by 9/07/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 36 Motion to defer ruling; denying 48 Motion for Hearing; denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment (NH)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER adopting 67 Stipulation Regarding Discovery Matters. Discovery due by 2/28/2018. Discovery Motions and Plaintiffs' response to Motion for Protective Order due by 3/16/2018. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/31/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER adopting 64 Stipulation Regarding Discovery Motions. Discovery Motions due by 12/18/2017. Plaintiff's response to Motion for Protective Order due by 12/18/2017. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2018 at 2:00 PM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2017 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Oil & Gas, Inc. v. EOG Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Oil & Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Nick A. Swartzendruber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?