Ward et al v. Wind River Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Keith Ward, William Clark and Kody Clark
Defendant: Wind River Trucking, LLC and Todd Bradford
Case Number: 1:2016cv00418
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The parties shall submit either a revised scheduling plan or a report to the court by 12/09/2019. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 MOTION to Continue. The pretrial deadlines are stayed pending further order of the court. The final pretrial conference set for 7/1/2019 and trial set for 7/15/2019 are cancelled. Both shall be rescheduled at a later date and time. The case caption shall be amended to include Brad Jensen as a named defendant. (BG)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justen Barks. (ZE) Regenerated NEF to Attorney Justen Barks on 2/26/2018. (rh)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint by 1/12/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael D. Stanger. (BG) NEF regenerated to Attorney Stanger on 2/24/2017 (cjs).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward et al v. Wind River Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Ward
Represented By: Charles M.R. Vethan
Represented By: Andrew Julius Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Clark
Represented By: Charles M.R. Vethan
Represented By: Andrew Julius Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kody Clark
Represented By: Charles M.R. Vethan
Represented By: Andrew Julius Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wind River Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?