Zielinski v. Royer
Plaintiff: Zane Zielinski
Defendant: Reagan Royer and WCE Oil Field Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00040
Filed: February 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 44 MOTION to Amend Discovery Schedule. Discovery due by 2/8/2019. Discovery Motions due by 2/8/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/8/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/8/2019. Discovery depositions of expert witnesses due by 5/9/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/2019. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 11/19/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 12/2/2019 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (7 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (FPT and jury trial previously set for 7/02/2019 and 7/16/2019) (BG)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2017 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zielinski v. Royer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zane Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reagan Royer
Represented By: William P. Harrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCE Oil Field Services, LLC
Represented By: William P. Harrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?