Everett v. Marks et al
Plaintiff: Tilmer Everett
Defendant: Roger Marks, III, Dean Clarkson, Dan Donlin, Richard Riha, Tessa Vargan, Karlei Neufeld, Julie Lawyer and Cynthia Feland
Case Number: 1:2017cv00136
Filed: July 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration. (BG) Distributed on 4/30/2018. (rh)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER dismissing this case in its entirety. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 10/26/2017 (cjs).
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr finding as moot 11 Motion to Submit CD's as Evidence for Civil Rights§ 1983 Complaint in pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; finding as moot 12 Motion to Submit CourtRecords in Case No. 06-K-126 as Evidence for Civil Rights § 1983 Complaint, in support of three (3) CD's addressed August 17, 2017 (BG) Distributed on 8/30/2017 (cjs).
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 6 Motion for Discovery. (BG) Distributed on 8/21/2017. (rh)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Clerk's office shall seal Ex. 6 to 6 MOTION for Discovery filed by Tilmer Everett as it contains sensitive personal information. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 7/27/2017 (cd).
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerks office shall seal Exs. E, F, G, H, I, N, and O to 2 PLRA Packet as they contain sensitive personal information. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 7/18/2017 (cjs).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everett v. Marks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tilmer Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Marks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Donlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Riha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tessa Vargan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karlei Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Lawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Feland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?