Stassinos et al v. XTO Energy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Stassinos and Ryann Stassinos
Defendant: XTO Energy Inc., Badlands Consulting, LLC, Thomas Jones, Petroleum Experience, Inc., Allan Kolden, Weatherford International, LLC, Weatherford U.S., L.P. and KLX Energy Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00138
Filed: July 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 54 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Reagan M. Brown. (BG)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 03:00 PM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2017 at 10:30 AM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will provide the contact information for the conference call in a separate email. (ZE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stassinos et al v. XTO Energy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Stassinos
Represented By: James E. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: David S. Maring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryann Stassinos
Represented By: James E. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael J. Fitzgerald
Represented By: David S. Maring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badlands Consulting, LLC
Represented By: C. Todd Koebele
Represented By: Roland John Wells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Jones
Represented By: C. Todd Koebele
Represented By: Roland John Wells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petroleum Experience, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Behrmann
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Kolden
Represented By: William J. Behrmann
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford International, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Davis
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Davis
Represented By: Mary Elizondo Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLX Energy Services LLC
Represented By: Courtney A. Presthus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?