Royal v. Badlands Power Fuels LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Royal
Defendant: Badlands Power Fuels LLC and F. Brian Upsher
Case Number: 1:2017cv00143
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas E. Caldwell. (BG) Regenerated to Attorney Caldwell on 10/17/2017. (rh)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2018 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal v. Badlands Power Fuels LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Royal
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badlands Power Fuels LLC
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Brian Upsher
Represented By: Paul Rudell Oppegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?