Association of Equipment Manufacturers et al v. Burgum et al

Plaintiff: Association of Equipment Manufacturers, AGCO Corporation, CNH Industrial America LLC, Deere & Company and Kubota Tractor Corporation
Defendant: Doug Burgum and Wayne Stenehjem
Case Number: 1:2017cv00151
Filed: July 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 85 Motion to Compel. (BG)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 126 MOTION to cancel April 30, 2019 Pre-Trial Conference and Bench Trial docketed to begin on May 14, 2019. The Final Pre-Trial Conference and Bench Trial are cancelled. They shall be rescheduled as necessary at a later date. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney W. Kirby Bissell. (BG) NEF regenerated to PHV attorney on 10/23/2017 (cjs).
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason Allen (ZE) NEF regenerated to PHV attorney on 8/25/2017. (cd)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED ORDER granting 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and 1 Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Champaign; granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin R. Dryden; granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jarren Ginsburg; granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Lockerby; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Connor A. Sabatino; granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Roberta F. Howell. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Equipment Manufacturers et al v. Burgum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Equipment Manufacturers
Represented By: Katherine Susan Barrett Wiik
Represented By: Lauren Champaign
Represented By: Benjamin R. Dryden
Represented By: Jarren Ginsburg
Represented By: Roberta F. Howell
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Connor A. Sabatino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGCO Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Susan Barrett Wiik
Represented By: Lauren Champaign
Represented By: Benjamin R. Dryden
Represented By: Jarren Ginsburg
Represented By: Roberta F. Howell
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Connor A. Sabatino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: Katherine Susan Barrett Wiik
Represented By: Lauren Champaign
Represented By: Benjamin R. Dryden
Represented By: Jarren Ginsburg
Represented By: Roberta F. Howell
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Connor A. Sabatino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deere & Company
Represented By: Katherine Susan Barrett Wiik
Represented By: Lauren Champaign
Represented By: Benjamin R. Dryden
Represented By: Jarren Ginsburg
Represented By: Roberta F. Howell
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Connor A. Sabatino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kubota Tractor Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Susan Barrett Wiik
Represented By: Lauren Champaign
Represented By: Benjamin R. Dryden
Represented By: Jarren Ginsburg
Represented By: Roberta F. Howell
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Connor A. Sabatino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Burgum
Represented By: Joseph P. Bialke
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Stenehjem
Represented By: Joseph P. Bialke
Represented By: Matthew A. Sagsveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?