Cropper v. Northern Truck Equipment Corporation et al
Plaintiff: James Cropper, Jr.
Defendant: Northern Truck Equipment Corporation and Monroe Truck Equipment, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00160
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 4/17/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 4/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days). Responses to pending motions in limine due by 3/1/2019. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (amended to correct start time of trial)(BG)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cropper v. Northern Truck Equipment Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cropper, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Maring
Represented By: Jared J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Truck Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Corey J. Quinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Truck Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Represented By: Jessica M Rydell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?