Savy Surfers, Inc. v. Wings of Minot ND LLC
Plaintiff: Savy Surfers, Inc.
Defendant: Wings of Minot ND LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00164
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER adopting 34 Stipulation. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 1/14/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Jury Trial REset for 1/28/2020 at 9:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Judge Peter D. Welte (3 days). By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (FPT and jury trial previously set for 11/07/2019 and 11/19/2019, respectively) (BG)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 15 Motion in Limine. (RLB)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2018 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2017 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savy Surfers, Inc. v. Wings of Minot ND LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savy Surfers, Inc.
Represented By: Kirstin D. Kanski
Represented By: James A. Lodoen
Represented By: Charles E. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wings of Minot ND LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Hasbrouck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?