Weese v. Kodiak Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Weese
Defendant: Kodiak Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00189
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER on objections to deposition designation. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson.(DM)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER/ORDER setting presumptive time limits for witnesses. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (DM)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER adopting 43 Stipulation filed by Donald Weese. Discovery due by 3/15/2019. Discovery Motions due by 3/15/2019. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 8/7/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial set for 8/20/2019 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (FPT and jury trial previously set for 1/15/2019 and 1/29/2019, respectively)(BG)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2017 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weese v. Kodiak Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Weese
Represented By: Nathan Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodiak Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Kent A. Reierson
Represented By: Lisa Six
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?