Pennington et al v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rhonda Pennington, Steven Nelson, Donald Nelson and Charlene Bjornson
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Charlene Bjornson, Donald Nelson, Steven Nelson and Rhonda Pennington
Case Number: 1:2017cv00211
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 2/02/2018 is canceled. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Early Settlement Conference set for 2/2/2018 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathan A. Keever. (ZE) Regenerated to Attorney Keever on 10/20/2017. (rh)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2017 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington et al v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Pennington
Represented By: Fintan L. Dooley
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nelson
Represented By: Fintan L. Dooley
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Nelson
Represented By: Fintan L. Dooley
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Bjornson
Represented By: Fintan L. Dooley
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Danielle M. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Danielle M. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Charlene Bjornson
Represented By: Fintan L. Dooley
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Donald Nelson
Represented By: Fintan L. Dooley
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Steven Nelson
Represented By: Fintan L. Dooley
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rhonda Pennington
Represented By: Fintan L. Dooley
Represented By: Nathan A. Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?