Kuntz v. Educational Credit Management Corp.
Plaintiff: Riley S. Kuntz
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00031
Filed: February 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter recused. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 7/22/2019 (am).
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 5/17/2018. (rh)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE) Distributed on 4/19/2018 (cjs).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuntz v. Educational Credit Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley S. Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Corp.
Represented By: Ryan C. McCamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?