Williams v. Colter Energy Services USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tristan Williams
Defendant: Colter Energy Services USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00036
Filed: February 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 9:00 AM in Fargo ADR Room before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting 22 Motion to Stay pending further order of the court. (BG)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 7/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/30/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Repor ts due by 8/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Jury Trial REset for 4/20/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days). By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (FPT and jury trial previously set for 12/03/2019 and 12/17/2019, respectively) (BG)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 03:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2018 at 10:30 AM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 6 Motion to Substitute Party. (ZE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Colter Energy Services USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan Williams
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colter Energy Services USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brett M. Wendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?