Paystrup v. Doman Farms Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John James Paystrup
Defendant: Doman Farms Logistics, LLC, Nomarco Inc. and Thomas Doman
Case Number: 1:2018cv00050
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Modified on 6/22/2020 to correct event type. Regenerated NEF(cjs).
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re final pretrial conference set for 9/08/2020 at 9:00 am. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 24 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (LJH)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paystrup v. Doman Farms Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John James Paystrup
Represented By: Thomas E. Kalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doman Farms Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomarco Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Doman
Represented By: Douglas Alan Bahr
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?