First International Bank & Trust v. Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC
Plaintiff: First International Bank & Trust
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00067
Filed: April 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) or Rule 56 filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #77 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Defendant's reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damage Claim is due by 5/06/2020. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #66 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) or Rule 56. Replies due by 5/6/2020. (am)
April 28, 2020 Filing 77 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
April 15, 2020 Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) or Rule 56 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) or Rule 56 filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua)
April 9, 2020 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney Paul Forster in Support of re #74 Reply to Response to Motion by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 - Expert Disclosures of Oasis Petroleum North America LLC, #2 Exhibit 10 - Helling Trust 11-15H Tree Survey dated 11/2/17, #3 Exhibit 11 - 2019 Helling Trust 11-15H Tree Survey Report dated 7/26/19)(Forster, Paul)
April 9, 2020 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
April 9, 2020 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant's reply brief in support of its Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson shall not exceed 12 pages. Defendant's reply brief in support of its Motion in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs shall not exceed 9 pages. (CM)
April 8, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
March 26, 2020 Filing 70 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
March 16, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #68 RESPONSE to Motion. Clerks office added exhibit letters to docket text; #69 RESPONSE to Motion. Clerks office added exhibit letters to docket text. (js)
March 13, 2020 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion re #46 MOTION in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Selection from Valuing Contaminated Properties, #2 Exhibit Rose Hoefs curriculum vitae, #3 Exhibit B - Selection from the book Environmental Site Assessments & Their Impact on Property Value The Appraiser's Role, #4 Exhibit C - Selection from the book Environmental Site Assessments & Their Impact on Property Value The Appraiser's Role, #5 Exhibit D - Selection from the book Valuing Contaminated Properties, #6 Exhibit E - Selection from the book Environmental Site Assessments & Their Impact on Property Value The Appraiser's Role)(Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 3/16/2020 to add exhibit letters to docket text. (js)
March 13, 2020 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robin Bay's deposition taken September 4, 2019, #2 Exhibit B - Ken Carlson deposition taken September 4, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - Daniel Branham deposition taken May 15, 2019, #4 Exhibit D - Habitat Management's Helling Trust 11-15H Tree Survey)(Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 3/16/2020 to add exhibit letters. (js)
March 11, 2020 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Support re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) or Rule 56 filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
March 11, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) or Rule 56 by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
March 10, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 (Text Only) ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference is REset for 11/24/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. To participate in the conference, the parties should call the telephone number and enter the access code previously provided. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (FPT previously set for 3/17/2020) (BG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (9 days). (RLB)
March 4, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #61 REPLY to Response. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as RESPONSE to Motion at #62 . (as)
March 3, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by First International Bank & Trust. (as)
March 3, 2020 Filing 61 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 3/4/2020 to restrict access. (as)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 (Text Only) ORDER: The final pretrial conference set for 3/17/2020 is CANCELLED. It shall be rescheduled at a later date. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
March 2, 2020 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated: Jury Trial set for 3/31/2020 (9 days) at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. is CANCELLED. To be reset at a later date. (RLB) Modified on 3/2/2020 (am).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER adopting #57 Stipulation Extend Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint and #58 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Defendant answer due to plaintiff's amended complaint due by 3/11/2020. Once the court has ruled on the pending appeal of the magistrate judges order granting plaintiffs motion for leave to amend its complaint, the parties shall have 21 days to file motions to bifurcate the trial. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
February 27, 2020 Filing 58 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Move for Bifurcation by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
February 27, 2020 Filing 57 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
February 26, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #56 Objection. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office corrected event from Objection to Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Judge and regenerated the NEF. (rh)
February 25, 2020 Filing 56 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #50 Order (OBJECTION to Order Granting Motion to Amend Complaint) by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul) Modified on 2/26/2020 to correct event type. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting #54 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to Respond to Motions in Limine by Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Plaintiff's response to Motions in Limine #43 and #46 is due on or before 3/13/2020. Defendant's reply brief is due on of before 3/27/2020.(RLB)
February 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #46 MOTION in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs, #43 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson. Responses due by 3/13/2020. Replies due by 3/27/2020. (am)
February 20, 2020 Filing 54 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motions in Limine by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua)
February 14, 2020 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC filed by First International Bank & Trust.(Swanson, Joshua)
February 13, 2020 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel L. Hovland: Status Conference held on 2/13/2020. (Court Reporter None) (jr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 51 STIPULATION re #43 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson, #46 MOTION in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motions in Limine by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #23 Motion to Amend/Correct. (JS)
February 4, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Parties are to call in per instructions in separate email. (CM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney Benjamin Sand re #46 MOTION in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Rose Hoefs's A Retrospective Appraisal Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Rose Hoefs)(Forster, Paul)
January 31, 2020 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support re #46 MOTION in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
January 31, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
January 29, 2020 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney Benjamin Sand re #43 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mark Anderson Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - Vegetation Impact Assessment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcript of Mark Anderson, #4 Exhibit 4 - Green Ash Woodlands: A Review, #5 Exhibit 5 - Conditions of Green Ash, Incident of Ash Yellows Phytoplasmas, and Their Association in the Great Plains and Rocky Mountain Regions of North America, #6 Exhibit 6 - Duth Elm Disease in North Dakota: A New Look, #7 Exhibit 7 - Measuring & Monitoring Plant Populations, Chapter 7: Sampling Design, #8 Exhibit 8 - An evaluation of sample adequacy for point analysis of ground cover)(Forster, Paul) (Attachment 8 replaced on 1/30/2020 to produce ECF document header) (lf).
January 29, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support re #43 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
January 29, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 42 BRIEF Defendant's Memorandum Regarding Legal Standard on Motion to Amend Complaint to Include Exemplary Damages by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
December 13, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #40 Response to Motion. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Brief at #41 . (rh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 41 BRIEF re #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #39 Order by First International Bank & Trust. (rh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 40 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Notice (Other) to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 12/13/2019 to restrict access. (rh)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER For Additional Filing by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation re #37 Stipulation filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. Motions to bifurcate trial are due 21 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to amend the complaint to add punitive damages. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(JS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Move for Bifurcation by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (Text Only) ORDER: The court grants the parties' #35 Motion and approves their Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
August 19, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION approve Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement)(Forster, Paul)
July 29, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #34 REPLY to Response to Motion. Clerks office added exhibit letter and 'Proposed' Language to docket text. (js)
July 26, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Notice (Other) to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 7/29/2019 to add exhibit letter. (js)
July 12, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Benjamin Sand re #31 Response to Motion by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Form 10K Fast Answers, #2 Exhibit 2 - NDDEQ Incident Summary Report - Other Responsible Party, #3 Exhibit NDDEQ Incident Summary Report - Unknown Responsible Party, #4 Exhibit NDDOH Brief, #5 Exhibit 5 - NDDOH Consent Decrees)(Sand, Benjamin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Dustin Anderson re #31 Response to Motion by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Helling Trust Remediation Update Quarterly Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Helling Trust Remediation Timeline)(Sand, Benjamin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Notice (Other) to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Sand, Benjamin)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (BG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation re #27 Stipulation filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint is reset for 7/12/2019. Plaintiff's deadline to file its Reply to its Motion to Amend Complaint is reset for 7/26/2019. (GD)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Notice (Other) to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages. Responses due by 7/12/2019 Replies due by 7/26/2019. (rh)
July 1, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #26 Witness List. Clerk's office restricted access to document. Pursuant to the Local Rules of Civil Procedure 26.1(C), discovery materials are not to be filed except when required for a pending motion or when otherwise ordered by the court. (cjs)
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Notice (Other) to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages To Extend Time to Respond by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 *RESTRICTED-FILED IN ERROR* Witness List by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 7/1/2019 to restrict access (cjs).
June 21, 2019 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #23 Motion to Amend/Correct. Clerk's office linked to correct document; re: #25 Memorandum in Support. Clerk's office added exhibit numbers to attachments. (cjs)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Rockeman Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2-May 17, 2018 email to Helling Trust from the State, #3 Exhibit 3-14 page spreadsheet provided by data steward, #4 Exhibit 4-Cody VanderBusch Deposition, #5 Exhibit 5-Summary of the Industrial Commission's records from spills, #6 Exhibit 6-Spill reports Oasis filed with Industrial Commission, #7 Exhibit 7-November 10, 2015 email from assistant attorney general, #8 Exhibit 8-LOAN letter and Expedited Settlement Offer from the NDDEQ, #9 Exhibit 9- Administrative Consent Agreement in Case No. 12-005 APC, #10 Exhibit 10-Administrative Consent Agreement in Case No. 13-035 APC, #11 Exhibit 11-Summons and Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12-Consent Decree, #13 Exhibit 13-Consent Agreement Case No. 246868, #14 Exhibit 14-Consent Agreement Case No. 24595, #15 Exhibit 15-Hicks Deposition, #16 Exhibit 16-Daniel Branham Deposition, #17 Exhibit 17-Branham Deposition Exhibit 27)(Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 6/21/2019 to add exhibit numbers and correct link (cjs).
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Joshua Swanson re #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct link(cjs).
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct link(cjs).
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by First International Bank & Trust to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Punitive Damages (Swanson, Joshua)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Plaintiff shall have until 6/20/2019 to Amend Pleadings to Add Claims for Punitive Damages. (GD)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by First International Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation to Extend, #2 Exhibit - Proposed Order)(Swanson, Joshua) Modified on 5/30/2019 to remove duplicative docket text - NEF regenerated. (js)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case, as referral judge. (kmk)
February 12, 2019 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Change as to Judge only). (kmk)
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 3/31/2020 (9 days) at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (GD)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr.) by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(GD)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 8/23/2019. Discovery Motions due by 8/23/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/28/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/9/2019. Expert Discovery due by 9/6/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/11/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 9/27/2019. Threshold Motions due by 1/11/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/27/2019.(GD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 (Text-Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 9/21/2018. (GD) Modified on 10/2/2018 to add text-only to docket text. (as)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2018 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 7, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #8 Motion to Strike. (MM)
May 7, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's request for treble damages filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
April 23, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's request for treble damages Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua)
April 9, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's request for treble damages filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
April 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's request for treble damages by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
April 9, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Oasis Petroleum LLC, Other Affiliate Oasis Petroleum Inc. for Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC.. (Forster, Paul)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh)
April 9, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (rh)
April 3, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by First International Bank & Trust. (cjs)
April 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to First International Bank & Trust. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/17/2018. (cd)
April 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/17/2018. (cd)
April 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC from Mountrail County, case number not assigned. Filing fee $400, receipt number 118000819, filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Exhibit 1 - Industrial Commission of North Dakota Oil and Gas Division Spill-Incident Report, #5 Exhibit D - Exhibit 2 - Photo, #6 Exhibit E - Exhibit 3 - Photo, #7 Exhibit F - Exhibit 4 - Photo, #8 Exhibit G - Exhibit 5 - Photo, #9 Exhibit H - Exhibit 6 - Photo, #10 Exhibit I - Exhibit 7 - Photo, #11 Exhibit J - Exhibit 8 - Photo, #12 Exhibit K - Exhibit 9 - Photo, #13 Exhibit L - Exhibit 10 - Photo, #14 Exhibit M - Exhibit 11 - Oilfield Environmental Incident Summary, #15 Exhibit N - Exhibit 12 - Sundry Notices and Reports on Wells-Form 4, #16 Exhibit O - Exhibit 13 - Industrial Commission Complaint, #17 Exhibit P - Exhibit 14 - Consent Agreement, #18 Exhibit Q - Exhibit 15 - Photo, #19 Exhibit R - Exhibit 16 - Photo, #20 Exhibit S - Exhibit 17 - Photo, #21 Exhibit T - Exhibit 18 - Photo, #22 Exhibit U - Exhibit 19 - Photo, #23 Exhibit V - Exhibit 20 - Photo, #24 Exhibit W - Exhibit 21 - Photo, #25 Exhibit X - Exhibit 22 - Photo, #26 Exhibit Y - Exhibit 23 - Photo, #27 Exhibit Z - Exhibit 24 - Photo, #28 Exhibit AA - Exhibit 25 - Soil Boring and Monitoring Well Location Map, #29 Exhibit Affidavit of Daniel W. Branham, #30 Exhibit CC - Affidavit of Service - Summons and Complaint, #31 Exhibit DD - Notice of Filing Summons and Complaint, #32 Exhibit EE - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #33 Exhibit FF - Ex. A - Notice of Removal, #34 Exhibit GG - Affidavit of Service - Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint, Notice of Removal)(cd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First International Bank & Trust v. Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: John W. Morrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First International Bank & Trust
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Represented By: Drew James Hushka
Represented By: David T. Hermanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?